Global Patent Index - EP 0841183 B1

EP 0841183 B1 2000-04-05 - Recording apparatus

Title (en)

Recording apparatus

Title (de)

Aufzeichnungsgerät

Title (fr)

Appareil d'enregistrement

Publication

EP 0841183 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97119467 A

Priority

JP 29475296 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0841183A1] A tape printing apparatus (1) is provided with a step motor (SN) for feeding the top end of a recording medium (D2) with respect to a recording head (HD) on which heating elements are arranged in a row, a gear train (GY), and a cutting unit (KC) disposed downstream of the recording head (HD) in the feeding direction of the recording medium (D2). The control unit (CP) controls to feed the top end of the recording medium (D2) by a first length (L1) each corresponding to an arrangement length (L1) of the heating elements and to stop same to make the recording head (HD) perform recording thereon. It is noted that the control unit controls to feed the recording medium D2 so that the second feeding amount (L3) just before a cutting operation using the cutting unit (KC) is less than the arrangement length (L1) of the heating elements and to feed the same by the remaining third feeding amount (L4) after the cutting operation. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 11/70; B41J 15/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 3/36 (2006.01); B41J 3/407 (2006.01); B41J 11/42 (2006.01); B41J 11/66 (2006.01); B41J 11/70 (2006.01); B41J 15/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 15/04 (2013.01); B41J 3/4075 (2013.01); B41J 11/663 (2013.01); B41J 11/666 (2013.01); B41J 11/70 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0841183 A1 19980513; EP 0841183 B1 20000405; DE 69701613 D1 20000511; DE 69701613 T2 20000907; JP 3740760 B2 20060201; JP H10138580 A 19980526

INPADOC legal status


2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101106

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-08-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20110801

2011-08-11 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69701613

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-07-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20101106

2010-10-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BROTHER KOGYO K.K.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091120

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091007

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091130

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081128

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-03-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-05-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69701613

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-11

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

1999-01-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE DE FR GB

1999-01-27 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

1999-01-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19981126

1998-11-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980908

1998-05-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

1998-05-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI