Global Patent Index - EP 0841259 B1

EP 0841259 B1 2000-01-05 - Suspension element for tool with SDS-shaft

Title (en)

Suspension element for tool with SDS-shaft

Title (de)

Aufhängeorgan für Werkzeuge mit einem SDS-Schaft

Title (fr)

Elément de suspension pour outils à manche SDS

Publication

EP 0841259 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97117849 A

Priority

DE 19642611 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0841259A1] The device has a suspension flap with a hole and an elastically deformable ring body to hold the tool shaft. The ring has an internal projection (13) and two or more opposite free spaces (20). The projection is wedge-shaped, and extends over all or part of the ring body length. The flap is connected via webs (15) to the ring body. The ring body also has additional raised parts (18) on the inside, which are smaller than the projection.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 73/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 73/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 73/0064 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0841259 A1 19980513; EP 0841259 B1 20000105; CN 1101327 C 20030212; CN 1188062 A 19980722; US 5979652 A 19991109

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161102

2017-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170503

2017-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161015

2017-07-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170630

2017-06-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20161015

2017-05-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59700967

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151022

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-10-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2000-12-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-05-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000407

2000-04-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-04-03 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: FUMERO BREVETTI S.N.C.

2000-02-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59700967 20000210

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-01-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

1999-01-27 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-12-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981014

1998-11-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980911

1998-05-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT