Global Patent Index - EP 0841274 B1

EP 0841274 B1 2000-04-05 - Device for taking off a thin, flat and flexible article from a receiving support

Title (en)

Device for taking off a thin, flat and flexible article from a receiving support

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Abnehmen eines dünnen, flachen, flexiblen Abschnitts einer Ablage

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour enlever un article fin, plat et flexible d'un support de réception

Publication

EP 0841274 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97119327 A

Priority

DE 29619463 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0841274A2] A supply of especially plastic foil (1) is surrendered from a roll to rest on a surface (2) on which it is conveyed (3) to a cutter (5) and reduced to units of the required length. Immediately after being cut to length the foil (7) comes to rest on a surface (6) from which it is lifted by the arms of a rotating (10) star wheel (9). Each foil section is lifted by a sequence of arms (8). The post-cutter surface incorporates a number of parallel grooves with vertical side-walls (11) pointing in the direction of travel. The base of each groove is closed but incorporates a number of air jet outlets (15). The air jets are arranged on the foil inlet to blow air under the section into the grooves.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 29/40; B65H 29/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/24 (2006.01); B65H 29/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/40 (2013.01); B31B 70/04 (2017.08); B65H 29/245 (2013.01); B65H 2404/6551 (2013.01); B65H 2701/1212 (2013.01); B65H 2701/191 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29619463 U1 19980305; EP 0841274 A2 19980513; EP 0841274 A3 19981202; EP 0841274 B1 20000405; ES 2146446 T3 20000801

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051105

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20031213

2003-09-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-08-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030601

2003-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-06-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2003-06-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030603

2003-06-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030601

2003-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SACHSENRING ENTWICKLUNGSG.- M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20021130

2002-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021130

2002-11-06 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021106

2002-11-05 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021105

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20011129

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-11-23 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20011123

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-11-12 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20011112

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-10-12 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20011012

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-10-09 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20011009

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-10-01 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20011001

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-03-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000807

2000-08-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2146446 T3

2000-07-03 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: SACHSENRING MASCHINENBAU GMBH

2000-06-27 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701396 20000511

2000-05-10 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SACHSENRING MASCHINENBAU GMBH

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

1999-08-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

1999-06-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990423

1999-02-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981202

1998-12-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-12-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-05-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

1998-05-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI