Global Patent Index - EP 0841278 B1

EP 0841278 B1 2001-12-05 - Bobbin changing- and transport arrangement

Title (en)

Bobbin changing- and transport arrangement

Title (de)

Spulenwechsel- und Transporteinrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de changement et de transport de bobines

Publication

EP 0841278 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97113827 A

Priority

DE 19646337 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0841278A2] The device comprises a transporter system in each machine, and a transfer unit (1) between them. The unit has two transporter plates (9), rotating in the same direction, and guided bobbin and sleeve handling devices (42) to lift and lower spinning cops and empty sleeves (60). The transporter plates have driver elements on their outer circumference. During rotation of a plate, the elements pass through transporter tracks associated with one or other of the transporter systems. The handling devices are controlled via stationary control links (35). Each of these has an upper cam (36) to move the main body (41) of the handling device, and a lower cam (37) to operate a bobbin foot positioner (49) and a sleeve grab (56).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 67/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 67/02 (2006.01); B65H 67/06 (2006.01); D01H 9/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 67/06 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0841278 A2 19980513; EP 0841278 A3 19980909; EP 0841278 B1 20011205; DE 19646337 A1 19980514; JP 3689230 B2 20050831; JP H10139284 A 19980526; TR 199701312 A2 19980521; TR 199701312 A3 19980521; US 5924273 A 19990720

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130811

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120806

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100302

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080826

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2007-06-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070430

2007-04-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2005-08-19 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050819

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-08-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050810

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-04-06 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040811

2004-08-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040811

2004-02-29 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: W. *SCHLAFHORST A.G. & CO.

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-07-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030730

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-08-20 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20020820

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-06-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020627

2002-05-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59705657 20020117

2002-01-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011207

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2001-08-03 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2001-04-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010219

1999-05-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

1999-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

1999-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990309

1998-09-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-05-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI