Global Patent Index - EP 0841298 A3

EP 0841298 A3 2002-11-27 - Control arrangement with detection of the weight of the load

Title (en)

Control arrangement with detection of the weight of the load

Title (de)

Steuerungsanordnung mit Erkennung des Gewichts der Last

Title (fr)

Système de commande avec détection du poids de la charge.

Publication

EP 0841298 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97118120 A

Priority

DE 19645812 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19645812C1] The hoist with electric motor driven lifting gear has a load sensing detector and electronic control system to influence the raising of the load according to comparison of the load weight with predetermined maximum and minimum values. The load is attached to a hook (5) and is lifted by a cable (4) wound on a drum (3) rotated in either direction by an electric pole-change motor (8) through a brake (25). The load sensor (33) provides a signal to a microprocessor unit (16) which controls both the motor and brake. A hand-held control switch unit (13) also provides input to the microprocessor to raise or lower the load at slow and fast speeds. The microprocessor is programmed with data according to the load and shuts down the motor when preset conditions are not met.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66D 1/58; B66C 13/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66D 1/46 (2006.01); B66D 1/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66D 1/46 (2013.01); B66D 1/58 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19645812 C1 19980226; DE 59712540 D1 20060330; EP 0841298 A2 19980513; EP 0841298 A3 20021127; EP 0841298 B1 20060104

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20171017

2017-11-08 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20171017

2017-10-18 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59712540

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160929

- Year of fee payment: 20

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060104

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070223

2007-02-23 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2006-12-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061005

2006-04-15 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060415

2006-03-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59712540 P 20060330

2006-01-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060104

2006-01-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2006-01-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-01-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060104

2005-06-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050425

2003-08-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030411

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

1998-05-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-05-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI