Global Patent Index - EP 0841384 B1

EP 0841384 B1 2001-05-30 - Masking tape for painting operations

Title (en)

Masking tape for painting operations

Title (de)

Abdeckbahn für Mal- und Lackierarbeiten

Title (fr)

Ruban de masquage pour opérations de peinture

Publication

EP 0841384 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97119252 A

Priority

DE 29619424 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5935669A] A cover sheet for painting, plastering, cleaning and lacquering jobs consists of a material sheet (10) folded into at least two folding layers (12a-12h) with longitudinally extending folds (11a-11h). A longitudinal edge portion (13) of the material sheet (10) protrudes beyond the other folding layers (12b-12h), an adhesive tape (16) being fastened along the longitudinal edge portion (13) and protruding laterally beyond the longitudinal edge portion (13). The adhesive-free side (18) of the adhesive tape (16) is provided with a cover strip (20) covering the adhesive tape (16). Using a cover strip and an adhesive tape, the desired properties of this combination may be selected from a great variety of possible combinations by selecting the corresponding tapes and strips.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C09J 7/02; B05B 15/04; B44D 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 15/04 (2006.01); B44D 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B44D 3/00 (2013.01); B05B 12/24 (2018.02); Y10S 428/906 (2013.01); Y10T 428/14 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24231 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24793 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29619424 U1 19971113; EP 0841384 A2 19980513; EP 0841384 A3 19990203; EP 0841384 B1 20010530; ES 2159081 T3 20010916; US 5935669 A 19990810

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091104

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090603

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081203

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071214

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2007-08-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070731

2007-02-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20051105

2006-07-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051104

2005-11-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20051118

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-11-05 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051105

2005-11-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051104

2004-11-25 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20041125

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-10-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20041027

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2159081 T3

2001-07-16 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. A. GIAMBROCONO & C. S.R.L.

2001-07-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59703666 20010705

2001-06-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000630

1999-10-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

1999-09-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990721

1999-02-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-02-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-05-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1998-05-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI