Global Patent Index - EP 0841418 B1

EP 0841418 B1 2001-05-23 - Device for controlling the warp thread tension and loom using such device

Title (en)

Device for controlling the warp thread tension and loom using such device

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Steuerung eines Webkettenspanners und Webmaschine mit dieser Vorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour contrôler la tension des fils de chaîne et métier à tisser avec un tel dispositif

Publication

EP 0841418 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96810773 A

Priority

EP 96810773 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0841418A1] The mechanism to control the warp tension, in a loom, comprises at least one shut-off (34) in the linking channel between a hydraulic spring unit (21) at the warp tensioner (4), and the hydraulic fluid container (33). Increasing or decreasing the hydraulic fluid volume alters the stiffness of the hydraulic spring unit to define the swing movement range of the warp tensioner.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 49/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03D 49/12 (2006.01); D03D 49/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 49/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0841418 A1 19980513; EP 0841418 B1 20010523; DE 59608400 D1 20020117; JP 3875782 B2 20070131; JP H10140442 A 19980526; US 5890519 A 19990406

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120601

2012-09-13 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59608400

- Effective date: 20120601

2012-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111112

2012-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111130

2012-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SULZER TEXTIL A.G.

- Effective date: 20111130

2011-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20101117

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101119

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100907

- Year of fee payment: 15

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59608400 20020117

2002-01-10 [REG DE 8570] REINSTATEMENT OF THE FORMER POSITION

2001-07-19 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. ZINI MARANESI & C. S.R.L.

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE IT

2000-05-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SULZER TEXTIL AG

2000-04-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000229

1999-03-31 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): BE DE IT

1999-03-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

1999-01-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH LI

1999-01-27 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH LI

1998-12-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981014

1998-05-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE IT

1998-05-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI