Global Patent Index - EP 0841441 B1

EP 0841441 B1 2003-06-25 - Roofing material

Title (en)

Roofing material

Title (de)

Bedeckungsmaterial

Title (fr)

Matériau de couverture

Publication

EP 0841441 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97402688 A

Priority

FR 9613766 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0841441A1] The lightweight corrugated roofing material, e.g. of a bitumen-impregnated cellulose material, a plastic such as PVC or of steel, is designed to be used on its own or as a support for flat or channelled tiles, and has corrugations (2) with transverse recesses (3) at intervals for the tiles to engage with. The amplitude and pitch of the corrugations are in a ratio of between 1 : 1 and 1 : 2, and the upper surfaces of their crests, which are slightly flattened, are roughened, having projections between 0.1 and 0.9 mm high and at a rate of between 1 and 100 per sq cm.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 7/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 3/30 (2006.01); E04B 7/20 (2006.01); E04D 3/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 7/205 (2013.01); E04D 3/34 (2013.01); E04D 3/40 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24355 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24479 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24694 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24702 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24711 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0841441 A1 19980513; EP 0841441 B1 20030625; AT 243798 T 20030715; BR 9705459 A 20011120; CA 2221130 A1 19980512; CA 2221130 C 20070821; CN 1080807 C 20020313; CN 1185510 A 19980624; DE 69723030 D1 20030731; DE 69723030 T2 20040429; DE 841441 T1 19981022; DK 0841441 T3 20031020; ES 2117617 T1 19980816; ES 2117617 T3 20040316; FR 2755712 A1 19980515; FR 2755712 B1 19990806; HK 1010231 A1 20020830; ID 19092 A 19980611; MX 9708664 A 19980930; MY 125450 A 20060830; PL 195643 B1 20071031; PL 323034 A1 19980525; PT 841441 E 20031128; RU 2188288 C2 20020827; TR 9701347 A2 19980521; US 5928764 A 19990727; ZA 9710158 B 19980528

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-29 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20171109

2017-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-11-10 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69723030

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161104

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160907

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20161010

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-12-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160907

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160907

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160905

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160906

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-09-05 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-29 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140512

2014-08-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131111

2014-08-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140601

2014-07-01 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2014-06-18 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140601

2014-05-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121110

2014-05-20 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20140512

2014-04-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121130

2013-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121130

2013-10-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121110

2013-08-30 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20030403740

- Effective date: 20130604

2013-08-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130604

2013-08-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121110

2013-08-14 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2013-07-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121110

2013-07-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 243798 T

- Effective date: 20121110

2013-07-08 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2013-03-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20121120

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-02-28 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20120511

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20121005

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-01-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20111125

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-11-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20110926

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-10-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20110921

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-10-31 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20110916

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-10-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20110919

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-05-19 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ONDULINE S.A., FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ONDULINE S.A., PARIS, FR

- Document: DE 69723030

- Effective date: 20110316

2011-05-05 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: ONDULINE

- Effective date: 20110420

2011-04-01 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2011-03-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20101119

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-02-09 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20110121

2011-02-09 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20110121

2011-01-31 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: ONDULINE38 RUE BAUDIN, F-92300 LEVALLOIS-PERRET

- Effective date: 20110120

2011-01-31 [BECN] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S NAME

- Owner name: ONDULINE

- Effective date: 20110120

2011-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20101108

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-01-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: ONDULINE

- Free text: ONDULINE S.A.#38, RUE SAINT FERDINAND#75017 PARIS (FR) -TRANSFER TO- ONDULINE#35 RUE BAUDIN#92300 LEVALLOIS-PERRET (FR)

2010-12-29 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20101202 AND 20101208

2010-12-23 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: OMNIUM FRANCAIS INDUSTRIEL ET COMMERCIAL OFIC, FR

- Effective date: 20101216

2004-06-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040326

2004-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2117617 T3

2003-10-15 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20030403740

2003-09-30 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69723030 P 20030731

2003-07-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2003-07-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-07-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KELLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2003-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-06-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010507

1999-01-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-01-27 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-01-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981113

1998-12-16 [IECL] IE: TRANSLATION FOR EP CLAIMS FILED

1998-10-22 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

1998-09-15 [TCAT] AT: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

1998-09-01 [TCNL] NL: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

1998-08-16 [REG ES BA2A] PROVISIONAL PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2117617 T1

1998-08-05 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

1998-07-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: COSTI, ALBERT

1998-05-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE