Global Patent Index - EP 0841443 B1

EP 0841443 B1 2003-06-04 - Automatic door sealing device

Title (en)

Automatic door sealing device

Title (de)

Eckverbindung für beplankte Wände

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'étanchéité automatique pour une porte

Publication

EP 0841443 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97118689 A

Priority

DE 29619659 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0841443A1] The joint is for use between two walls at right angles, these each comprise of inner and outer skins joined by profiled sheet-metal components. The two inner skins (1a) are secured from the outside against one of the flanges (4b,4a) of an inner profiled component (4), and the two outer skins (1b,2b) to one flange (5b,5a) of an outer profiled component (5). The two components are joined together to form a one-piece profiled corner connector (3). The inner skin of one wall (2) can bear against one flange of the inner profiled component, being held on the outside by lugs (11) stamped and bent out from the adjacent surface (4a) of the component at right angles to the flange. The corner joint can extend from the edge of one outer skin (1b) to the face side of the other outer skin (2b).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04F 17/00; E04B 2/74; E04B 2/78

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/74 (2006.01); E04B 2/72 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/7457 (2013.01); E04B 2002/725 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GR IE IT LI NL PT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29619659 U1 19970220; AT 242384 T 20030615; EP 0841443 A1 19980513; EP 0841443 B1 20030604; ES 2200107 T3 20040301

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071028

2009-05-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080505

2009-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071029

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071031

2009-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20071029

2008-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20061020

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080630

2008-08-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071028

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080501

2006-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-10-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20061030

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-10-25 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20061025

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-10-25 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20061025

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-10-24 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061024

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-07-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040501

2004-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-05-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040501

2004-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *RICHTER-SYSTEM G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20031031

2004-04-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2200107 T3

2004-01-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2003-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-10-15 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20030403520

2003-09-04 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030904

2003-09-04 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030904

2003-07-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: INTERPAT LAW AG

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59710211 P 20030710

2003-07-09 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-06-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GR IE IT LI NL PT

2003-06-04 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030604

2002-05-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020328

1999-01-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GR IE IT LI NL PT

1999-01-27 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GR IE IT LI NL PT

1998-09-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980703

1998-05-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GR IE IT LI NL PT

1998-05-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI