Global Patent Index - EP 0841467 B1

EP 0841467 B1 2000-07-05 - Rock milling head

Title (en)

Rock milling head

Title (de)

Gesteinsfräskopf

Title (fr)

Tête de fraisage pour le coupage de roche

Publication

EP 0841467 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97118802 A

Priority

DE 19645650 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19645650C1] The cutting head is fitted to a support arm which positions it into the cutting positions. A steel housing has a motor (18) in the top end, under the mounting flange (5) for the support arm. Three in-line pinions (20,22,21a) form a reduction gear train down the housing. The last gear carries the double axle stubs (21) with cutting heads at each end. The whole housing is sealed against ingress of grit. The steel housing has two parallel side flanges in which the support bearings for the gearwheels are fitted. The size of the housing is determined by the diameter of the largest, middle gearwheel.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21D 9/10; E21C 31/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02F 3/20 (2006.01); E21B 3/00 (2006.01); E21D 9/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21D 9/1026 (2013.01); E02F 3/205 (2013.01); E21D 9/1086 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19645650 C1 19980122; AT 194409 T 20000715; EP 0841467 A1 19980513; EP 0841467 B1 20000705; JP H10196284 A 19980728; US 6158818 A 20001212

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161029

2017-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170503

2017-06-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20161029

2017-05-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59701966

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150921

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-05-07 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ATLAS MASCHINEN GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: KAELBLE GMBH, 74582 GERABRONN, DE

- Document: DE 59701966

- Effective date: 20150401

2015-05-07 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59701966

- Representative's name: ANDRAE WESTENDORP PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT, DE

- Effective date: 20150401

2015-04-01 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20150305 AND 20150311

2015-04-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59701966

- Representative's name: ANDRAE WESTENDORP PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT, DE

2014-07-16 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20140619 AND 20140625

2014-06-12 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KAELBLE GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: TEREX GERMANY GMBH & CO. KG, 40597 DUESSELDORF, DE

- Document: DE 59701966

- Effective date: 20140430

2014-06-12 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ATLAS MASCHINEN GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: TEREX GERMANY GMBH & CO. KG, 40597 DUESSELDORF, DE

- Document: DE 59701966

- Effective date: 20140430

2014-06-12 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59701966

- Representative's name: ANDRAE WESTENDORP PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT, DE

- Effective date: 20140430

2014-01-29 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20140102 AND 20140108

2013-05-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: TEREX GERMANY GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SCHAEFF-TEREX GMBH & CO. KG, 74595 LANGENBURG, DE

- Document: DE 59701966

- Effective date: 20130318

2013-05-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KAELBLE GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SCHAEFF-TEREX GMBH & CO. KG, 74595 LANGENBURG, DE

- Document: DE 59701966

- Effective date: 20130318

2013-05-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ATLAS MASCHINEN GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SCHAEFF-TEREX GMBH & CO. KG, 74595 LANGENBURG, DE

- Document: DE 59701966

- Effective date: 20130318

2013-05-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59701966

- Representative's name: HOESSLE PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT, DE

- Effective date: 20130318

2013-05-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59701966

- Representative's name: ANDRAE WESTENDORP PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT, DE

- Effective date: 20130318

2013-03-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59701966

- Representative's name: HOESSLE PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT, DE

2004-10-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041029

2003-10-09 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20031009

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-07-30 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-01 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-09-27 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BOTTI & FERRARI S.R.L.

2000-08-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000808

2000-08-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701966 20000810

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE GB IT

2000-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 194409 T 20000715

1999-12-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991014

1999-03-31 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT DE GB IT

1999-01-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE GB IT

1999-01-27 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT DE GB IT

1998-06-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980408

1998-05-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE GB IT

1998-05-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI