Global Patent Index - EP 0841472 B1

EP 0841472 B1 2000-12-06 - Tappet in an internal combustion engine and a method of manufacturing the tappet

Title (en)

Tappet in an internal combustion engine and a method of manufacturing the tappet

Title (de)

Ventilstössel in einer Brennkraftmaschine und dessen Herstellungsverfahren

Title (fr)

Poussoir de soupape pour moteur à combustion interne et méthode de fabrication

Publication

EP 0841472 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96117760 A

Priority

EP 96117760 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0841472A1] Light metal tappets have been widely used in an internal combustion engine instead of conventional steel tappets. On the upper surface of a top wall (22) of a body (8), a wear resistant cam receiving plate (10) is put, and a projection (30) of the cam receiving plate (10) is engaged in a groove (28) of the top wall (22), so that the cam receiving plate (10) is integrally connected with the body (8), thereby making the tappet smaller and lighter. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 1/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21K 1/20 (2006.01); F01L 1/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/143 (2013.01); B21K 1/20 (2013.01); F01L 2103/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0841472 A1 19980513; EP 0841472 B1 20001206; DE 69611174 D1 20010111; DE 69611174 T2 20010802

INPADOC legal status


2003-06-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2003-06-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030603

2002-11-06 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021106

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-11-13 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20011113

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-11-12 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20011112

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-05-04 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-01-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69611174 20010111

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-12-06 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001206

2000-12-06 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001206

2000-03-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990702

1999-08-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990702

1999-01-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

1999-01-27 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-11-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980918

1998-05-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-05-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI