Global Patent Index - EP 0841483 B1

EP 0841483 B1 2002-09-04 - Gear pump with rotary sealing bar

Title (en)

Gear pump with rotary sealing bar

Title (de)

Zahnradpumpe mit drehbarem Dichtsteg

Title (fr)

Pompe à engrenages avec butée d'étanchéité rotative

Publication

EP 0841483 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98101245 A

Priority

EP 98101245 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0841483A2] The pump has a housing (G) with a groove (QN,FN) containing a sealing strip (DBS) to separate suction and pressure sides (SS,DS). The pivot point of the strip is positioned in the plane defined by the axis of the two toothed gears (Z1,2). There may be a turnable sealing strip on each end face of a gear. The movement of the strips is adjusted dependant upon the values measured by an RPM counter for the gears.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04C 2/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04C 2/08 (2006.01); F04C 2/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04C 2/18 (2013.01); F04C 2/088 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0841483 A2 19980513; EP 0841483 A3 19980805; EP 0841483 B1 20020904; DE 59805364 D1 20021010

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-08-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050802

2005-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2004-03-26 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040326

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-02-05 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040205

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2002-11-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805364 20021010

2002-09-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE LI

2001-02-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001227

1999-04-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE LI

1999-04-21 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): CH DE LI

1998-12-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981001

1998-08-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-08-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-05-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE LI

1998-05-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI