Global Patent Index - EP 0841517 B1

EP 0841517 B1 2001-12-19 - Fuel injection device for a gas turbine combustion chamber with a liquid cooled injection nozzle

Title (en)

Fuel injection device for a gas turbine combustion chamber with a liquid cooled injection nozzle

Title (de)

Kraftstoffeinspritzvorrichtung für eine Gasturbinen-Brennkammer mit einer flüssigkeitsgekühlten Einspritzdüse

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'injection du combustible pour une chambre de combustion d'une turbine à gaz avec une buse d'injection refroidie par un liquide

Publication

EP 0841517 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97114341 A

Priority

DE 19645961 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0841517A2] The nozzle (1) has a coolant tube (10) enclosing and clear of its fuel tube (4), and which leads near the nozzle outlet (7) into an annular chamber (9) directly enclosing the fuel tube. Inside the coolant tube and upstream of the annular chamber when seen in the fuel-flow direction is a partition (11) enclosing the fuel tube. This divides the coolant tube interior into first and second segments (12a,12b) connected respectively to coolant feed (13) and discharge (14) passages. The coolant tube can be mounted directly in a nozzle holder, while the fuel tube is mounted via an angle-piece (19) in the holder. A first coolant passage in the holder leads into the coolant tube, while a fuel feed passage (3) leads into the hollow angle-piece.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23D 11/36; F23D 11/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23D 11/24 (2006.01); F23D 11/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23D 11/24 (2013.01); F23D 11/36 (2013.01); F23D 2206/10 (2013.01); F23D 2214/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0841517 A2 19980513; EP 0841517 A3 19981223; EP 0841517 B1 20011219; CA 2220213 A1 19980507; CA 2220213 C 20060404; DE 19645961 A1 19980514; US 6003781 A 19991221

INPADOC legal status


2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100820

2011-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-06-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59705876

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-05-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-04-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100820

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090827

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090825

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090817

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-04-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020318

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59705876 20020131

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-03-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ROLLS-ROYCE DEUTSCHLAND LTD & CO KG

2000-12-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001031

2000-05-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ROLLS-ROYCE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

1999-09-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

1999-06-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990503

1998-12-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-12-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

1998-05-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-05-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI