Global Patent Index - EP 0841726 B1

EP 0841726 B1 2001-12-05 - Multipole plug

Title (en)

Multipole plug

Title (de)

Mehrpolige Steckverbindung

Title (fr)

Fiche à plusieurs pôles

Publication

EP 0841726 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97117630 A

Priority

DE 19645852 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0841726A2] The connector has a plug housing (1) with a foot (1a) and a projecting sleeve (1b), enclosing base contact pins (2) and a pair of phase reversal pins (3), supported by a rotatable insert (4) incorporated in the foot, allowing the position of the phase pins relative to the base pins to be reversed by rotation through 180 degrees. The position of the rotatable insert relative to the foot is secured by a spring arm (6) in 2 defined angular positions, by cooperation of locking noses with locking openings provided by the foot.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 29/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 29/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 29/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE ES GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0841726 A2 19980513; EP 0841726 A3 19991124; EP 0841726 B1 20011205; DE 19645852 C1 19980806; ES 2164974 T3 20020301

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20031112

2003-07-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030501

2003-06-04 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20021011

2003-05-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030501

2003-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ALOYS MENNEKES ANLAGENG.- M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-10-12 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021012

2002-10-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021011

2002-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2164974 T3

2002-02-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE ES GB NL

2001-12-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01R 29/00 A

2001-05-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010411

2000-09-07 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2000-08-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE ES GB NL

1999-11-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-05-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971129

1998-05-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE ES GB NL