Global patent index - EP 0841867 B1

EP 0841867 B1 2000-05-31 - DEVICE FOR CLEANING SLATTED CURTAINS AND PROCESS FOR ITS USE

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR CLEANING SLATTED CURTAINS AND PROCESS FOR ITS USE

Title (de)

EINRICHTUNG ZUM REINIGEN VON LAMELLENVORHÄNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER ANWENDUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE NETTOYER DES RIDEAUX A LAMELLES ET SON PROCEDE D'UTILISATION

Publication

EP 0841867 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96928340 A

Priority

  • DE 9601411 W
  • DE 19528857 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19528857C1] Prior art devices require expensive material and either do not separate the washing and rinsing liquids or do so only with a great technical complexity. Corresponding processes for using the devices are complicated and thus cost-intensive. To avoid these drawbacks, the device consists of one supply container (3) for washing liquid and another (3) for rinsing liquid, both of the same design and with the same type of operating components, these containers being used separately. In a corresponding process for using this device, the supply container (3) of washing liquid is replaced after the washing process by one (3) containing rinsing liquid.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 4/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 4/00 (2006.01); B08B 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 4/00 (2013.01); B08B 3/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DK FR IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19528857 C1 19961017; AT 193429 T 20000615; EP 0841867 A2 19980520; EP 0841867 B1 20000531; US 6206013 B1 20010327; US 6276377 B1 20010821; WO 9705816 A2 19970220; WO 9705816 A3 19970313

INPADOC legal status

2005-07-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050730

2004-04-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2004-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20040201

2004-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2004-02-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040201

2003-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030730

2002-10-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021029

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020730

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-07-22 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020722

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-07-05 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020705

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: HORMANN WOLFGANG

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20000731

2000-09-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-08-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000831

2000-08-28 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000731

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DK FR IT LI NL

2000-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 193429

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1998-07-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980604

1998-05-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980127

1998-05-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DK FR IT LI NL