Global Patent Index - EP 0841995 B1

EP 0841995 B1 2000-03-22 - HIGH-SPEED THIN-SLABBING PLANT

Title (en)

HIGH-SPEED THIN-SLABBING PLANT

Title (de)

HOCHGESCHWINDIGKEITS-DÜNNBRAMMENANLAGE

Title (fr)

UNITE DE PRODUCTION DE BRAMES MINCES A HAUTE VITESSE

Publication

EP 0841995 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96928327 A

Priority

  • DE 9601378 W
  • DE 19529049 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9705971A1] The invention pertains to a plant to produce hot-rolled steel strip from a band of continuous cast input stock in a sequence of process steps, characterized by a continuous casting plant with a continuous casting and rolling unit with a casting speed of 4-8 m/min and a solidification thickness of 90-125 mm, using an oscillating continuous casting die with concavity between cast level and die outlet and/or a casting guide with concavity and/or with centering and guide elements in the continuous casting stand in the region of their narrow sides for purposes of guiding and centering the slab. A cooling and insulating section is provided between continuous casting plant and soaking furnace for the input stock strip and a crossover furnace of about 45 m in length and about 5 to 20 m in width, downstream of the continuous casting plant and upstream of the blooming mill.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21B 1/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 1/00 (2006.01); B21B 1/46 (2006.01); B22D 11/12 (2006.01); B22D 11/20 (2006.01); B21B 1/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21B 1/466 (2013.01); B21B 1/34 (2013.01); Y10T 29/5184 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9705971 A1 19970220; AT 190876 T 20000415; AU 6784796 A 19970305; AU 696074 B2 19980903; BR 9609962 A 19990202; CA 2228280 A1 19970220; CN 1075964 C 20011212; CN 1192170 A 19980902; DE 19529049 C1 19970320; DE 19680651 D2 19981001; EP 0841995 A1 19980520; EP 0841995 B1 20000322; JP H11510099 A 19990907; KR 100266827 B1 20000915; RU 2166387 C2 20010510; TR 9800123 T1 19980521; US 5991991 A 19991130; ZA 9606395 B 19970219

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050719

2006-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060201

2005-07-19 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050719

2005-07-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050719

2005-07-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050719

2004-07-06 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040706

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-07-05 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20040705

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040630

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-04-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040201

2004-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-02-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040201

2004-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SMS DEMAG A.G.

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-20 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030720

2002-07-24 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20020724

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-07-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020711

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-06-25 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20020625

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-06-25 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20020625

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-04-28 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: GUZZI E RAVIZZA S.R.L.

2000-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604788 20000427

2000-04-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000324

2000-03-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR GB IT NL SE

2000-03-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 190876 T 20000415

2000-03-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMS DEMAG AG

1999-06-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990504

1998-05-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980122

1998-05-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR GB IT NL SE