Global Patent Index - EP 0842001 B1

EP 0842001 B1 2001-03-21 - PLATE MOULD FOR PRODUCING STEEL BILLETS

Title (en)

PLATE MOULD FOR PRODUCING STEEL BILLETS

Title (de)

PLATTENKOKILLE ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON STRÄNGEN AUS STAHL

Title (fr)

MOULE EN FONTE POUR PLAQUES PERMETTANT DE PRODUIRE DES BARRES D'ACIER

Publication

EP 0842001 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96930954 A

Priority

  • DE 9601445 W
  • DE 19529931 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9704900A1] The invention concerns a plate mould for producing steel billets, in particular thin slabs, with water-cooled narrow side walls which can be clamped between broad side walls. The broad side walls comprise at least three adjacent mutually independent cooling segments (11 to 13, 21 to 23). The cooling segments are divided symmetrically relative to the centre axis of the mould and, in the region of the mould mouth (29), have separate connections (51, 53, 55) for the independent supply of a fluid cooling medium.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 11/04; B22D 11/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/16 (2006.01); B22D 11/04 (2006.01); B22D 11/05 (2006.01); B22D 11/055 (2006.01); B22D 11/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/0408 (2013.01); B22D 11/055 (2013.01); B22D 11/22 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9704900 A1 19970213; AT 199846 T 20010415; AU 6983896 A 19970226; BR 9609810 A 19990706; CN 1075966 C 20011212; CN 1195307 A 19981007; DE 19529931 C1 19970403; DE 19680629 D2 19980723; DE 59606639 D1 20010426; EP 0842001 A1 19980520; EP 0842001 B1 20010321; ES 2155199 T3 20010501; JP 3034957 B2 20000417; JP H11500361 A 19990112; RU 2142863 C1 19991220; US 6176295 B1 20010123

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20050729

2005-07-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050729

2005-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050729

2005-07-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050729

2004-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20030730

2004-07-05 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040705

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040630

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-04-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2004-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20040201

2004-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-02-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040203

2004-02-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040201

2004-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SMS DEMAG A.G.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030730

2002-07-24 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020724

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-07-22 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020722

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-07-11 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020711

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-07-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020711

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-06-25 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020625

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-03-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-06-05 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: GUZZI E RAVIZZA S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2155199

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-04-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59606639

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-04-26

2001-04-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-04-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010321

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2001-03-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 199846

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-04-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-08-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19991119

2000-02-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMS DEMAG AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1998-05-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980128

1998-05-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL