Global Patent Index - EP 0842094 B1

EP 0842094 B1 2000-04-19 - WOODEN CONTAINER

Title (en)

WOODEN CONTAINER

Title (de)

SCHALE AUS HOLZ

Title (fr)

BARQUETTE EN BOIS

Publication

EP 0842094 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96922083 A

Priority

  • FR 9508266 A
  • FR 9600870 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2736327A1] A method for packaging food that may be cooked or reheated in a thermal oven, wherein the food is placed in a container made of a single peeled-wood blank that is folded and assembled at the folded side walls thereof. A tray particularly suitable for use in the method is also disclosed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 8/00; B65D 25/06; B65D 81/34; B65D 85/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A21B 3/13 (2006.01); A21D 8/00 (2006.01); B65D 5/20 (2006.01); B65D 5/28 (2006.01); B65D 6/00 (2006.01); B65D 8/00 (2006.01); B65D 8/04 (2006.01); B65D 25/06 (2006.01); B65D 81/34 (2006.01); B65D 85/34 (2006.01); B65D 85/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 25/06 (2013.01); B65D 9/06 (2013.01); B65D 81/34 (2013.01); B65D 85/34 (2013.01); Y10S 249/01 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2736327 A1 19970110; FR 2736327 B1 19990305; AT 191893 T 20000515; CA 2226076 A1 19970130; CA 2226076 C 20060418; CN 1074375 C 20011107; CN 1190374 A 19980812; DE 69607845 D1 20000525; DE 69607845 T2 20001214; DE 842094 T1 19980924; DK 0842094 T3 20000911; EP 0842094 A1 19980520; EP 0842094 B1 20000419; ES 2147652 T3 20000916; GR 3033954 T3 20001130; IL 122849 A 20010826; IL 122849 D0 19980816; JP 3724810 B2 20051207; JP H11508861 A 19990803; PT 842094 E 20001031; US 5989616 A 19991123; WO 9702990 A1 19970130

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160608

2016-10-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160607

2016-10-03 [REG GR MA] RIGHT EXPIRED

- Document: GR 20000401639

- Effective date: 20160608

2016-09-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160926

2016-08-02 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160606

2016-07-27 [REG IE MK9A] PATENT EXPIRED

2016-06-29 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20160606

2016-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-06-13 [REG DK EUP] PATENT EXPIRED

- Effective date: 20160607

2016-06-10 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20160606

2016-06-07 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69607845

2015-08-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20150525

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150521

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150529

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-08-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20150525

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150527

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20150522

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20150522

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20150526

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150521

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150603

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150521

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-06-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20150526

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-12-18 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20131121 AND 20131127

2013-12-04 [REG GB S117] CORRECTION OF ERRORS IN PATENTS AND APPLICATIONS (SECT. 117/PATENTS ACT 1977)

- Free text: CORRECTIONS ALLOWED; REQUEST FOR CORRECTION UNDER SECTION 117 FILED ON 12 APRIL 2013 ALLOWED ON 5 NOVEMBER 2013

2013-11-06 [REG GB S117] CORRECTION OF ERRORS IN PATENTS AND APPLICATIONS (SECT. 117/PATENTS ACT 1977)

- Free text: REQUEST FILED; REQUEST FOR CORRECTION UNDER SECTION 117 FILED ON 12 APRIL 2013

2013-04-18 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ADB WOOD SAS, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BOUTON-HUGHES, PHILIPPE, MARCILLY EN VILLETTE, FR

- Document: DE 69607845

- Effective date: 20130221

2013-04-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69607845

- Representative's name: EISENFUEHR, SPEISER & PARTNER, DE

- Effective date: 20130221

2013-04-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69607845

- Representative's name: EISENFUEHR SPEISER PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAEL, DE

- Effective date: 20130221

2013-04-08 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: ADB WOOD

- Effective date: 20130325

2013-03-27 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20130319

2013-01-31 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20121115

2012-02-29 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20110616

2011-07-29 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20110616

2011-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100607

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100607

2009-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090615

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070702

2008-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080229

2008-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070630

2008-01-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070630

2008-01-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071207

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BOUTON-HUGHES PHILIPPE

- Effective date: 20070630

2007-12-26 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20071207

2006-06-06 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20060606

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-05-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20060529

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-05-25 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20060525

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-05-24 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060524

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000712

2000-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2147652 T3

2000-09-11 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-08-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000731

2000-07-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ABREMA AGENCE BREVETS ET MARQUES GANGUILLET & HUMP

2000-07-17 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

2000-05-31 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2000-05-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69607845 20000525

2000-04-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 191893 T 20000515

1998-09-24 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

1998-08-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980714

1998-08-19 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: BOUTON-HUGHES, PHILIPPE

1998-05-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980112

1998-05-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE