Global Patent Index - EP 0842098 B1

EP 0842098 B1 2000-11-02 - ARTICLE RETAINING SLEEVE

Title (en)

ARTICLE RETAINING SLEEVE

Title (de)

UMHÜLLENDER TRÄGER FÜR GEGENSTÄNDE

Title (fr)

ENVELOPPE DE RETENUE D'ARTICLES

Publication

EP 0842098 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96925027 A

Priority

  • GB 9601765 W
  • GB 9515627 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9705036A1] There is provided a paperboard sleeve (11) for retaining a plurality of cans (12), which sleeve has a top panel (13), side panels (14) and base panels. A mask panel (23) is provided at each end of the sleeve (11) and comprises a main panel (24) and side walls (25). The main panel (24) is hingedly connected to one of the base panels and the side walls (25) have means (26) for engaging in apertures which retain the heel portions of the cans. The mask panel acts as a bar code mask and gives an extra printing area.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 71/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 71/00 (2006.01); B65D 71/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 71/36 (2013.01); B65D 2571/0016 (2013.01); B65D 2571/00172 (2013.01); B65D 2571/00277 (2013.01); B65D 2571/00444 (2013.01); B65D 2571/0066 (2013.01); B65D 2571/00753 (2013.01); B65D 2571/00759 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IE IT NL PT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9705036 A1 19970213; AU 6528096 A 19970226; DE 69610839 D1 20001207; DE 69610839 T2 20010301; EP 0842098 A1 19980520; EP 0842098 B1 20001102; ES 2152543 T3 20010201; GB 9515627 D0 19950927; ZA 9605968 B 19970131

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050723

2004-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030724

2004-04-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-17 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030723

2004-02-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040203

2003-07-24 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030724

2003-07-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030723

2002-08-07 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020807

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-07-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020730

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-07-17 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020717

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-07-02 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020702

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-05-01 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-07-23 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010723

2001-04-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-02-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010202

2001-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2152543 T3

2000-12-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-12-13 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2000-12-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69610839 20001207

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IE IT NL PT

2000-11-02 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001102

2000-11-02 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001102

2000-07-12 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO ROMA S.P.A.

1999-01-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981207

1998-05-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980113

1998-05-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IE IT NL PT