Global Patent Index - EP 0842143 B3

EP 0842143 B3 2009-02-18 - 2-(4-SUBSTITUTED)-BENZYLAMINO-2-METHYL-PROPANAMIDE DERIVATIVES

Title (en)

2-(4-SUBSTITUTED)-BENZYLAMINO-2-METHYL-PROPANAMIDE DERIVATIVES

Title (de)

2-(4-SUBSTITUIERTE)-BENZYLAMINO-2-METHYL-PROPANAMID-DERIVATE

Title (fr)

DERIVES DE 2-(4-SUBSTITUE)-BENZYLAMINO-2-METHYLPROPANAMIDE

Publication

EP 0842143 B3 (EN)

Application

EP 96924888 A

Priority

  • EP 9602961 W
  • GB 9515412 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9705102A1] Novel 2-(4-substituted)-benzylamino-2-methyl-propanamides compounds, having CNS activity, of general formula (I) wherein: n is zero, 1, 2 or 3; X is -O-, -S-, -CH2- or -NH-; each of R and R1 independently is hydrogen, C1-C6 alkyl, halogen, hydroxy, C1-C4 alkoxy or trifluoromethyl; each of R2, R3 and R4 independently is hydrogen, C1-C6 alkyl or C3-C7 cycloalkyl; and the pharmaceutically acceptable salts thereof, are disclosed.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/00 (2006.01); C07C 237/06 (2006.01); A61K 31/16 (2006.01); A61K 31/165 (2006.01); A61P 25/16 (2006.01); A61P 25/20 (2006.01); A61P 25/24 (2006.01); C07C 231/12 (2006.01); C07C 321/30 (2006.01); C07C 323/32 (2006.01); C07C 323/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07C 237/06 (2013.01); C07C 323/36 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

Designated extension state (EPC)

SI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9705102 A1 19970213; AR 003469 A1 19980805; AT 202078 T 20010615; AU 6418796 A 19970226; AU 711309 B2 19991007; AU 711309 C 19970226; BR 9609849 A 19990316; BR 9609849 B1 20100518; CA 2226894 A1 19970213; CA 2226894 C 20090331; CN 1085659 C 20020529; CN 1192199 A 19980902; DE 69613377 D1 20010719; DE 69613377 T2 20010920; DE 69613377 T4 20090813; DK 0842143 T3 20010723; DK 0842143 T5 20090602; EA 001322 B1 20010226; EA 199800170 A1 19980827; EP 0842143 A1 19980520; EP 0842143 B1 20010613; EP 0842143 B3 20090218; ES 2159749 T3 20011016; ES 2159749 T7 20090618; GB 9515412 D0 19950927; GR 3036559 T3 20011231; HU 227806 B1 20120328; HU 9900351 A2 19990628; HU 9900351 A3 19991129; IL 122705 A 20010128; IL 122705 D0 19980816; JP 2000500732 A 20000125; JP 4040089 B2 20080130; KR 100412747 B1 20040428; MX 9800718 A 19980430; NO 324273 B1 20070917; NO 980290 A 19980122; NO 980290 D0 19980122; NZ 313185 A 20000526; PL 184302 B1 20020930; PL 324639 A1 19980608; PT 842143 E 20011030; SI 0842143 T1 20010831; US 5945454 A 19990831; ZA 9605998 B 19970131

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160706

2017-01-30 [REG DK EUP] PATENT EXPIRED

- Effective date: 20160705

2016-11-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160713

2016-10-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160705

2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160704

2016-10-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20161026

2016-10-03 [REG GR MA] RIGHT EXPIRED

- Document: GR 20090402087

- Effective date: 20160706

2016-08-24 [REG IE MK9A] PATENT EXPIRED

2016-08-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 202078 T

- Effective date: 20160705

2016-07-27 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20160704

2016-07-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-07-06 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20160704

2016-07-05 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69613377

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150727

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20150727

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20150729

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150619

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150717

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20150729

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150729

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20150727

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150727

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150727

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150914

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20150729

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20150729

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150726

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20150623

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-09-25 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20090402087

2009-06-30 [REG SI SP73] CHANGE OF DATA ON OWNER

- Owner name: NEWRON PHARMACEUTICALS S.P.A.; IT

- Effective date: 20090506

2009-06-02 [NLXE] NL: OTHER COMMUNICATIONS CONCERNING EP-PATENTS (PART 3 HEADING XE)

- Free text: ACCORDING TO THE EUROPEAN PATENT CONVENTION ART. 105 A CHANGED TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED ON 20090403

2009-06-02 [REG DK T5] CORRECTED TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2009-03-13 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

2009-03-13 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: NEWRON PHARMACEUTICALS S.P.A.

- Free text: NEWRON PHARMACEUTICALS S.P.A.#VIA R. LEPETIT 34#21040 GERENZANO (VARESE) (IT) -TRANSFER TO- NEWRON PHARMACEUTICALS S.P.A.#VIA LUDOVICO ARIOSTO 21#20091 BRESSO (MI) (IT)

2008-06-11 [LIM1] LIMITATION IS ADMISSIBLE

- Free text: SEQUENCE NO: 1; FILED AFTER OPPOSITION PERIOD

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

2004-04-30 [REG PT TE4A] CHANGE OF ADDRESS (PATENT)

- Free text: NEWRON PHARMACEUTICALS S.P.A. IT

- Effective date: 20040209

2002-06-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2159749 T3

2001-08-08 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2001-08-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-07-23 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-07-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69613377 20010719

2001-07-06 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. A. GIAMBROCONO & C. S.R.L.

2001-06-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG * TROESCH SCHEIDEGGE

2001-06-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2001-06-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 19980205

2001-06-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 202078 T 20010615

1999-10-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990819

1999-07-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: NEWRON PHARMACEUTICALS S.P.A.

1998-05-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980205

1998-05-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

1998-05-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 980205