Global Patent Index - EP 0842187 A4

EP 0842187 A4 2000-04-12 - HUMAN CYSTATIN E

Title (en)

HUMAN CYSTATIN E

Title (de)

HUMANCYSTANIN E

Title (fr)

CYSTATINE E HUMAINE

Publication

EP 0842187 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 95922973 A

Priority

  • CA 2223888 A
  • US 9507135 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9639418A1] Disclosed is a human CysE polypeptide and DNA (RNA) encoding such polypeptide. Also provided is a procedure for producing such polypeptide by recombinant techniques. Also disclosed are methods for utilizing such polypeptide for treating osteoporosis, tumor metastases, microbial infections, viral infection, septic shock, inflammation, retinal irritation, caries, cachicia and muscle wasting. Diagnostic methods for detecting mutations in the coding sequence and alterations in the concentration of the polypeptides in a sample derived from a host are also disclosed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07H 21/02; C07H 21/04; C07K 14/00; C12Q 1/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07H 21/02 (2006.01); C07H 21/04 (2006.01); C07K 14/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/81 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/8139 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); A61K 48/00 (2013.01); C12N 2799/026 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] EP 0373771 A2 19900620 - TAISHO PHARMA CO LTD [JP], et al
  • [Y] WO 8809384 A1 19881201 - NORDISK GENTOFTE [DK]
  • [T] NI J ET AL: "Cystatin E is a novel human cysteine proteinase inhibitor with structural resemblance to family 2 cystatins.", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (1997 APR 18) 272 (16) 10853-8., XP002130248
  • [T] SOTIROPOULOU G ET AL: "Identification, cloning, and characterization of cystatin M, a novel cysteine proteinase inhibitor, down-regulated in breast cancer.", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (1997 JAN 10) 272 (2) 903-10., XP002130249
  • [XY] SNOW BRAND MILK PROD CO LTD: "WPI WORLD PATENT INFORMATION DERWENT,GB,DERWENT", WPI WORLD PATENT INFORMATION DERWENT,GB,DERWENT, VOL. 28, NR. 95, XP002031097 & JP H07126294 A 19950516 - SNOW BRAND MILK PROD CO LTD
  • See also references of WO 9639418A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9639418 A1 19961212; CA 2223888 A1 19961212; EP 0842187 A1 19980520; EP 0842187 A4 20000412

INPADOC legal status


2008-06-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080409

2007-01-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030401

2003-05-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030401

2000-04-12 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000229

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-05-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980102

1998-05-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE