Global Patent Index - EP 0842319 B1

EP 0842319 B1 2001-05-16 - U.V. ABSORBER COMPOSITIONS

Title (en)

U.V. ABSORBER COMPOSITIONS

Title (de)

UV-ABSORBIERENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS ABSORBANT LES UV

Publication

EP 0842319 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96925729 A

Priority

  • EP 9603050 W
  • GB 9526206 A
  • US 50133595 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9703242A1] Compositions of water insoluble or very sparingly soluble U.V. absorbers can be improved by the addition of a non-ionic surfactant which is an addition product of ethylene oxide or propylene oxide or both ethylene oxide and propylene oxide, and a mixture of fatty alcohols, fatty acids or fatty esters having 7-20 carbon atoms, preferably 14-18 carbon atoms or either tristyrylphenol or distyrylphenol. Such compositions have a good storage stability and excellent shear stability when the substrate to be dyed is a yarn which is in packed form.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06P 1/642; D06P 1/56; D06P 1/613

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C09K 3/00 (2006.01); D06P 1/44 (2006.01); D06P 1/56 (2006.01); D06P 1/58 (2006.01); D06P 1/613 (2006.01); D06P 1/642 (2006.01); D06P 5/02 (2006.01); D06P 5/04 (2006.01); D06P 5/06 (2006.01); D06P 5/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06P 1/56 (2013.01); D06P 1/58 (2013.01); D06P 1/6135 (2013.01); D06P 1/6426 (2013.01); D06P 5/02 (2013.01); D06P 5/04 (2013.01); D06P 5/06 (2013.01); D06P 5/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9703242 A1 19970130; AT 201244 T 20010615; BR 9609728 A 19990511; DE 69612853 D1 20010621; DE 69612853 T2 20011018; DK 0842319 T3 20010827; EP 0842319 A1 19980520; EP 0842319 B1 20010516; ES 2158328 T3 20010901; JP H11508935 A 19990803

INPADOC legal status


2012-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100712

2012-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100802

2011-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100712

2011-08-22 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2011-08-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110818

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100711

2011-05-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100711

2011-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100711

2010-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100202

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090711

2010-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090727

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-03-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090711

2010-02-26 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *CLARIANT FINANCE (BVI) LTD

- Effective date: 20090731

2009-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090706

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-11-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20090720

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090720

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-10-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20090714

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090702

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2009-05-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090331

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080630

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080612

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080620

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20080613

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080623

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-05-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2158328 T3

2001-08-27 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-08-09 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DRAGOTTI & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

2001-07-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: CLARIANT INTERNATIONAL LTD.

2001-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69612853 20010621

2001-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI SE

2001-05-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 201244 T 20010615

1998-12-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981106

1998-05-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971122

1998-05-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI SE