Global Patent Index - EP 0842337 B1

EP 0842337 B1 2000-12-13 - SOUND-DAMPING PARTITION

Title (en)

SOUND-DAMPING PARTITION

Title (de)

SCHALLDÄMMENDE TRENNWAND

Title (fr)

CLOISON INSONORISANTE

Publication

EP 0842337 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96922885 A

Priority

  • DE 19528825 A
  • EP 9602723 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19528825A1] The invention relates to a sound-damping partition, especially for the internal equipment of buildings. The partition consists essentially of a timber sub-frame (10) and two sets of planking (18, 20) on either wide side (12, 14) of the sub-frame (10) leaving a hollow space (16) filled with air and damping materials (36). To obtain improved airborne sound damping using simple means, the invention proposes that one of the sets of planking (20) be secured to the sub-frame (10) by means of thick-walled, soft elastic beads of adhesive (32) while the other set of planking (18) is rigidly clamped to said sub-frame (10).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/82

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/82 (2006.01); E04B 2/74 (2006.01); E04B 2/82 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/7409 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FI FR IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19528825 A1 19970206; AT 198089 T 20001215; AU 6359796 A 19970305; CA 2228311 A1 19970220; EP 0842337 A1 19980520; EP 0842337 B1 20001213; JP H11510228 A 19990907; US 6006484 A 19991228; WO 9706318 A1 19970220; WO 9706318 A8 20000302

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070622

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2007-04-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070101

2007-02-20 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-01-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070103

2007-01-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070101

2006-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-06-23 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060623

2006-06-22 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060622

2006-06-22 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060622

2006-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-08-01 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050801

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-22 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20050622

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-06-21 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050621

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-06-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050617

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-06-03 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050603

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20050531

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-07-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040728

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-10-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: SIKA SCHWEIZ AG

- Free text: SIKA AG, VORM. KASPAR WINKLER & CO.#TUEFFENWIES 16-22#CH-8048 ZUERICH (CH) -TRANSFER TO- SIKA SCHWEIZ AG#TUEFFENWIES 16-22#8064 ZUERICH (CH)

2003-10-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG

2003-09-12 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2003-04-01 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: SIKA SCHWEIZ AG

2001-12-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-04-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-02-27 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2001-01-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606223 20010118

2000-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FI FR IT LI NL SE

2000-12-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 198089 T 20001215

2000-04-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980612

1999-09-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIKA AG, VORM. KASPAR WINKLER & CO.

1998-07-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980612

1998-05-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980207

1998-05-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FI FR IT LI NL SE