Global Patent Index - EP 0842349 B1

EP 0842349 B1 2000-03-08 - CUTTING TOOL HOLDER RETENTION SYSTEM

Title (en)

CUTTING TOOL HOLDER RETENTION SYSTEM

Title (de)

BEFESTIGUNGSSYSTEM FÜR SCHNEIDWERKZEUGHALTER

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE MAINTIEN DE PORTE-OUTIL POUR OUTIL TRANCHANT

Publication

EP 0842349 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96925412 A

Priority

  • US 9612069 W
  • US 51045195 A
  • US 63905096 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9705363A1] An excavation cutting tool holder retention system. The cutting tool holder retention system includes a cutting tool holder having a holder engagement surface and a support block having a tool holder bore into which the cutting tool holder is inserted. A pin having a pin engagement surface is movably mounted to the support block such that the pin engagement surface may be moved to engage the holder engagement surface. At least one of the holder and pin engagement surfaces defines an inclined surface such that when the pin engagement surface is moved to engage the holder engagement surface, the shank portion of the cutting tool holder will be drawn into the tool holder bore. In the preferred embodiment, at least one of the shank portion of the cutting tool holder and tool holder bore is tapered such that the shank portion of the cutting tool holder will be drawn and wedged into the tool holder bore of the support block when the pin engagement surface is moved to engage the holder engagement surface.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21C 35/193; E21C 35/19

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21C 35/19 (2006.01); E21C 35/193 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21C 35/19 (2013.01); E21C 35/1933 (2013.01); E21C 2035/191 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9705363 A1 19970213; AU 6593096 A 19970226; AU 708619 B2 19990805; CA 2228419 A1 19970213; CN 1196771 A 19981021; DE 69607006 D1 20000413; DE 69607006 T2 20000928; DE 842349 T1 19990107; DE 962627 T1 20000608; EP 0842349 A1 19980520; EP 0842349 B1 20000308; PL 324866 A1 19980622

INPADOC legal status


2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000731

2003-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030201

2001-11-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2001-09-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010928

2001-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010731

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-03-14 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20000719

2001-02-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-07-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000719

2000-06-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-04-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69607006

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-04-13

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-01-07 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

- Ref Legal Event Code: DET

1998-07-24 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EL

1998-07-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980608

1998-05-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980202

1998-05-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB