Global Patent Index - EP 0842362 B1

EP 0842362 B1 2002-11-13 - SPIRAL COMPRESSOR, USEFUL IN PARTICULAR TO GENERATE COMPRESSED AIR FOR RAIL VEHICLES

Title (en)

SPIRAL COMPRESSOR, USEFUL IN PARTICULAR TO GENERATE COMPRESSED AIR FOR RAIL VEHICLES

Title (de)

SPIRALVERDICHTER, INSBESONDERE ZUM EINSATZ BEI DER DRUCKLUFTERZEUGUNG FÜR SCHIENENFAHRZEUGE

Title (fr)

COMPRESSEUR A SPIRALES, UTILE NOTAMMENT POUR GENERER DE L'AIR COMPRIME DANS DES VEHICULES SUR RAILS

Publication

EP 0842362 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96924755 A

Priority

  • DE 9601330 W
  • DE 19528071 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19528071A1] In a totally oil-free spiral compressor (1) with high suction volume flows and compression ratio, useful in particular to generate compressed air for rail vehicles, the spirals are arranged on one side only and measures are taken to accurately guide both spirals relatively to each other. For that purpose, a compression crown (15) is associated with an axial gap to one of the spirals (spiral 7) and the second spiral (spiral 9) is forcibly driven within the compression crown (15). The forced driving arrangement consists of supporting rollers (17) that extend axially from the second spiral towards the compression crown and that restrictedly roll in bores (19) pierced in the compression crown (15) and shaped as guiding rings, so that both spirals describe orbits with respect to each other, since their axes are offset and they are forcibly guided by the supporting rollers that roll in the bores.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04C 18/02; F01C 17/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01C 17/06 (2006.01); F04C 18/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04C 18/023 (2013.01); F01C 17/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19528071 A1 19970206; EP 0842362 A1 19980520; EP 0842362 B1 20021113; JP H11509903 A 19990831; US 6062833 A 20000516; WO 9705390 A1 19970213

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-02-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040203

2004-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *KNORR-BREMSE SYSTEME FUR SCHIENENFAHRZEUGE G.M.B.

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-20 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030720

2002-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59609873 20021219

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE IT SE

2002-11-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021113

2001-01-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001121

1998-05-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971204

1998-05-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE IT SE