Global Patent Index - EP 0842365 B1

EP 0842365 B1 2000-04-05 - LIQUID RING MACHINE

Title (en)

LIQUID RING MACHINE

Title (de)

FLÜSSIGKEITSRINGMASCHINE

Title (fr)

MACHINE A ANNEAU LIQUIDE

Publication

EP 0842365 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96933311 A

Priority

  • DE 9601429 W
  • DE 19528010 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9705392A1] The invention concerns a liquid ring machine in which decrease in flow is reduced in that the machine housing (1) is covered at least on its inner periphery (3) with a layer (4) comprising a structured surface with reduced surface roughness.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04C 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01C 21/10 (2006.01); F04C 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01C 21/106 (2013.01); F04C 19/00 (2013.01); F04C 2230/91 (2013.01); F05C 2225/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9705392 A1 19970213; CN 1097172 C 20021225; CN 1185198 A 19980617; EP 0842365 A1 19980520; EP 0842365 B1 20000405

INPADOC legal status


2014-01-08 [27C] TERMINATION OF OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Effective date: 20121110

2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-06-13 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080201

2008-03-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070731

2006-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060831

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-07-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060726

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-07-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060717

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-04-22 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2005-02-09 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2003-02-05 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: NASH-ELMO INDUSTRIES GMBH

2003-01-22 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: NASH-ELMO INDUSTRIES GMBH

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-02-28 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: STERLING FLUID SYSTEMS (GERMANY) GMBH

- Effective date: 20001227

2000-07-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000621

2000-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604899 20000511

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-12-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981029

1998-05-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980121

1998-05-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB