Global Patent Index - EP 0842381 B1

EP 0842381 B1 2000-01-12 - PROCESS AND SYSTEM FOR STARTING A FLOW STEAM GENERATOR

Title (en)

PROCESS AND SYSTEM FOR STARTING A FLOW STEAM GENERATOR

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUM ANFAHREN EINES DURCHLAUFDAMPFERZEUGERS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE DEMARRAGE D'UN GENERATEUR DE VAPEUR A PASSAGE

Publication

EP 0842381 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96924761 A

Priority

  • DE 9601343 W
  • DE 19528438 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19528438A1] A process is disclosed for starting a flow steam generator (1) with a combustion chamber (6) having a plurality of burners (5) for a fossil fuel (B) and a gas-tight external wall (2) made of at least approximately vertical evaporator pipes (4) through which feed water flows upwards. In order to avoid starting losses, the water level (H) in the evaporator pipes (4) and the ratio between fuel flow and feed water flow are set in such a way that the water (S) completely evaporates when flowing through the evaporator pipes (4), so that no more water is available at the evaporator outlet (10). For that purpose, a starting system (84) is used having regulating means (66) for regulating the water level (H) in the evaporator (4), as well as the ratio between fuel flow and feed water flow.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F22B 35/14; F22B 35/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F22B 35/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F22B 35/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19528438 A1 19970206; DE 19528438 C2 19980122; EP 0842381 A1 19980520; EP 0842381 B1 20000112; IN 189235 B 20030111; JP H11510241 A 19990907; US 5983639 A 19991116; WO 9705425 A1 19970213

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160718

2016-08-10 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20160718

2016-07-19 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59604183

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150709

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150918

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130719

2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140331

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120726

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120802

- Year of fee payment: 17

2003-03-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-18 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20011018

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-12-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-04-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000316

2000-04-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-03-28 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-02-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604183 20000217

2000-01-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-01-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1999-07-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990528

1998-05-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980121

1998-05-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI