Global Patent Index - EP 0842382 B1

EP 0842382 B1 2000-10-11 - SEMICONDUCTOR-TYPE COMPACT THERMAL APPARATUS

Title (en)

SEMICONDUCTOR-TYPE COMPACT THERMAL APPARATUS

Title (de)

H-THERMOKOMPAKTGERÄT

Title (fr)

APPAREIL THERMIQUE COMPACT DU TYPE A SEMI-CONDUCTEUR

Publication

EP 0842382 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96927630 A

Priority

  • DE 19528144 A
  • EP 9603346 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19600470A1] Thermoelectric modules are assembled to heat conductive plates which may be finned for the treatment of gas flow or bored to enable liquid flow. The assemblies may be used to heat and cool media or spaces by means of various control systems. Passage of a suitable electric current through the modules (36) creates a reduction in temperature on one side and a corresponding increase on the other. The modules are assembled to finned aluminium plates (34,35) with covers (30,31) through which air may be passed for air conditioning purposes. One air stream will be heated and the other cooled. Controlled switching and air flow control shutters may be used to maintain the temperature within a room or equipment enclosure. Thick plates with suitable holes bored through them may replace one or both finned plates for the control of liquid media.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 5/00; F25B 21/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 5/0042 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19600470 A1 19970206; DE 19600470 C2 19990610; AT 196946 T 20001015; AU 6739196 A 19970226; DE 19680617 D2 19981029; EP 0842382 A1 19980520; EP 0842382 B1 20001011; ES 2152037 T3 20010116; WO 9705432 A1 19970213

INPADOC legal status


2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090203

2007-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070731

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-07-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050730

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030811

2003-05-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-19 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020730

2003-03-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-07-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020730

2002-07-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020730

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-07-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20010731

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-07-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20010726

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-07-23 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20010723

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-07-06 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20010706

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-06-15 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20010615

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-02-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010116

2001-01-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2152037 T3

2001-01-03 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. ZINI MARANESI & C. S.R.L.

2000-12-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-11-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605991 20001116

2000-10-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-10-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: HANS RUDOLF GACHNANG PATENTANWALT

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 19970407

2000-10-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 196946 T 20001015

1999-12-15 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

1999-06-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990504

1998-05-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970528

1998-05-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

1998-05-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 970407