Global Patent Index - EP 0842385 B1

EP 0842385 B1 2001-04-18 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE PRODUCTION OF VARIABLE AMOUNTS OF A PRESSURIZED GASEOUS PRODUCT

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE PRODUCTION OF VARIABLE AMOUNTS OF A PRESSURIZED GASEOUS PRODUCT

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VARIABLEN ERZEUGUNG EINES GASFÖRMIGEN DRUCKPRODUKTS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE PRODUCTION VARIABLE D'UN PRODUIT GAZEUX COMPRIME

Publication

EP 0842385 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96927545 A

Priority

  • DE 19526785 A
  • EP 9603175 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19526785C1] In the method proposed, charge air is fed to a cryogenic rectifying system (15, 16) where it is split up into its constituent gases, and a liquid fraction (31, 32) is taken off and passed into a first storage tank (33). The pressure of any suitable amount of the liquid fraction (34) is increased (35). The liquid fraction (36) is then evaporated under the increased pressure by indirect heat exchange (12) and converted into a pressurized gaseous product (37). A heat-transfer fluid circulates in a refrigeration circuit fitted with a compressor (41, 42). Part (45) of the flow of heat-transfer fluid (44) compressed in the compressor (41, 42) is fed to the indirect heat-exchange unit (12) where the liquid fraction (36) is evaporated and the heat-transfer fluid (44) at least partly liquefied. Another part (59) of the flow of heat-transfer fluid (44) compressed in the compressor (41, 42) is allowed to expand (43), doing useful work. Liquefied heat-transfer fluid (45, 48) is stored in a buffer storage tank (49).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25J 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25J 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25J 3/04103 (2013.01); F25J 3/0409 (2013.01); F25J 3/04224 (2013.01); F25J 3/04309 (2013.01); F25J 3/04357 (2013.01); F25J 3/04393 (2013.01); F25J 3/04412 (2013.01); F25J 3/04509 (2013.01); F25J 2205/02 (2013.01); Y10S 62/913 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19526785 C1 19970220; AU 6734496 A 19970218; AU 719608 B2 20000511; BR 9609781 A 19991221; CA 2227050 A1 19970206; CN 1134638 C 20040114; CN 1191600 A 19980826; DE 59606808 D1 20010523; DK 0842385 T3 20010806; DK 0842385 T4 20040322; EP 0842385 A1 19980520; EP 0842385 B1 20010418; EP 0842385 B2 20031203; ES 2158336 T3 20010901; ES 2158336 T5 20040701; JP 3947565 B2 20070725; JP H11509615 A 19990824; KR 100421071 B1 20040417; MX 9800557 A 19980430; TW 318882 B 19971101; US 5953937 A 19990921; WO 9704279 A1 19970206; ZA 9606146 B 19970204

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150719

2016-08-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160826

2016-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150719

2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150731

2016-04-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150718

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150718

2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160202

2016-04-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160331

2016-03-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150718

2016-03-01 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2016-02-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59606808

2014-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140716

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140716

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140708

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-11-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20140711

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140716

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-08-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140611

- Year of fee payment: 19

2008-10-03 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2006-04-18 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2005-08-01 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050801

2004-08-27 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2004-07-15 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20040715

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-07-01 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

2004-03-22 [REG DK T4] TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT

2004-03-17 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

2004-03-02 [REG SE RPEO] EP PATENT HAS BEEN REPUBLISHED IN MODIFIED FORM AFTER OPPOSITION AT EPO

2003-12-03 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20031203

2003-12-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT SE

2002-03-13 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: L'AIR LIQUIDE, S.A. A DIRECTOIRE ET CONSEIL DE SUR

- Effective date: 20020117

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2158336 T3

2001-08-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-08-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010713

2001-08-06 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-07-13 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2001-05-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606808 20010523

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT SE

2000-10-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000904

1998-05-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980206

1998-05-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT SE