Global Patent Index - EP 0842387 B1

EP 0842387 B1 2000-04-19 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR INTRODUCING BULK MATERIAL INTO A ROTARY-HEARTH FURNACE

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR INTRODUCING BULK MATERIAL INTO A ROTARY-HEARTH FURNACE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR EINGABE VON SCHÜTTGUT IN EINEN DREHHERDOFEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT D'INTRODUIRE DES PRODUITS EN VRAC DANS UN FOUR A SOLE TOURNANTE

Publication

EP 0842387 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96930952 A

Priority

  • DE 9601442 W
  • DE 19529925 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19529925A1] The invention concerns a method of introducing bulk material onto the belt (13) of a rotary-hearth furnace (11) comprising hoods (12) which cover the hearth belt (13) and form a ring. According to the invention, the bulk material is placed on a conveyer (21) in a layer of which the thickness (HD) is proportional to the distance from the centre of the rotary hearth. The conveying speed (VF) of the conveyer is set at a given value, the surface of the bulk material is smoothed and the bulk material is then deposited with a constant thickness over the entire width of the hearth belt (13). The invention further concerns an arrangement for carrying out this method.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F27B 9/16; B65G 69/04; F27D 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10B 7/00 (2006.01); C10B 31/02 (2006.01); F27B 9/16 (2006.01); F27B 9/38 (2006.01); F27B 21/10 (2006.01); F27D 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10B 31/02 (2013.01); C10B 7/00 (2013.01); F27B 9/16 (2013.01); F27B 9/38 (2013.01); F27D 2003/0008 (2013.01); F27D 2003/0063 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19529925 A1 19970206; AU 6983696 A 19970226; AU 701827 B2 19990204; BR 9609819 A 19990706; CN 1104621 C 20030402; CN 1195399 A 19981007; DE 19680626 D2 19980723; EP 0842387 A1 19980520; EP 0842387 B1 20000419; JP 3037438 B2 20000424; JP H11500524 A 19990112; NO 980362 A 19980319; NO 980362 D0 19980127; RU 2146793 C1 20000320; US 5944514 A 19990831; WO 9705439 A1 19970213

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-01 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050201

2004-07-25 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040725

2003-07-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030711

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-07-10 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030710

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-07-08 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20030708

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-04-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-05-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605004 20000525

2000-04-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR SE

2000-02-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMS DEMAG AG

1998-11-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980929

1998-05-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980123

1998-05-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR SE