Global Patent Index - EP 0842489 B1

EP 0842489 B1 2000-06-07 - INPUT DEVICE FOR PROVIDING MULTI-DIMENSIONAL POSITION COORDINATE SIGNALS TO A COMPUTER

Title (en)

INPUT DEVICE FOR PROVIDING MULTI-DIMENSIONAL POSITION COORDINATE SIGNALS TO A COMPUTER

Title (de)

EINGABEVORRICHTUNG ZUM LIEFERN MULTIDIMENSIONALER POSITIONSKOORDINATESIGNALE AN EINEN RECHNER

Title (fr)

SYSTEME D'ENTREE SERVANT A TRANSMETTRE A UN ORDINATEUR DES SIGNAUX DE COORDONNEES DE POSITION A DIMENSIONS MULTIPLES

Publication

EP 0842489 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96925582 A

Priority

  • US 9612532 W
  • US 50908295 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9705567A1] A user input system for inputting computer signals, such as a joystick, has an elongated member or handle that is movably received by a housing. The handle is capable of moving in at least three perpendicular directions, i.e. along X, Y and Z axes, and is capable of being rotated about at least one of the three axes. In a first embodiment, a pair of light emitting diodes ("LEDs") are mounted at an end of the handle and oriented toward the interior of the housing. The LEDs are strobed to alternately project light downward into the housing. A light detecting element, such as a two-dimensional position sensing device ("PSD"), two one-dimension PSDs, or a four quadrant photodiode, is positioned opposite the LEDs, and mounted to the housing to receive the light from the LEDs to produce signals. The signals are converted from analog to digital and input to a microprocessor. The microprocessor, employing trigonometric methods, calculates the position and orientation (i.e. rotation) of the handle and outputs the coordinates to a host computer. The joystick preferably includes switches that produce signals and a slidable member that produces a variable signal, all of which are also output to the computer. In a second embodiment, the LEDs are mounted to the housing to project the light upward and the light detecting unit is mounted at the end of the handle.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06K 11/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G05G 9/047 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G05G 9/047 (2013.01); G05G 2009/04759 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9705567 A1 19970213; AU 6605596 A 19970226; DE 69608805 D1 20000713; DE 69608805 T2 20001012; EP 0842489 A1 19980520; EP 0842489 B1 20000607; US 5694153 A 19971202

INPADOC legal status


2015-04-08 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20150312 AND 20150318

2014-07-03 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Document: DE 69608805

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: G06K0011080000

- IPC: G06F0003033000

- Effective date: 20140526

2014-07-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69608805

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-05-26 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Document: DE 69608805

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: G06K0011080000

- IPC: G06F0003033000

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140331

2014-03-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-02-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69608805

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120725

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120719

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120725

- Year of fee payment: 17

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69608805 20000713

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-07-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980615

1998-05-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980227

1998-05-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB