Global patent index - EP 0842508 B1

EP 0842508 B1 2000-01-12 - ACOUSTIC WAVE FOCUSING METHOD AND DEVICE

Title (en)

ACOUSTIC WAVE FOCUSING METHOD AND DEVICE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM FOKUSSIEREN VON SCHALLWELLEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE FOCALISATION D'ONDES ACOUSTIQUES

Publication

EP 0842508 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96925774 A

Priority

  • FR 9601083 W
  • FR 9508543 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9703438A1] A method for making public announcements in a space (101) using n speakers (102) after having determined the impulse response hij(t) between a plurality of calibration points j belonging to said space and each speaker i. To transmit an information-bearing acoustic signal S(t) through at least one target area (114, 115, 123) in the space in which announcements are to be made, each speaker i is made to transmit a signal (a), where j is an index representing calibration points in the target area.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10K 11/34; H04R 27/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 1/40 (2006.01); G10K 11/34 (2006.01); H04R 27/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10K 11/346 (2013.01); H04R 27/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9703438 A1 19970130; DE 69606179 D1 20000217; DE 69606179 T2 20000817; DE 69638347 D1 20110512; EP 0842508 A1 19980520; EP 0842508 B1 20000112; EP 0944035 A2 19990922; EP 0944035 A3 20010418; EP 0944035 B1 20110330; JP 2000501896 A 20000215; JP 3675836 B2 20050727; US 2001001603 A1 20010524; US 6198829 B1 20010306; US 6978028 B2 20051220

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-03 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20160710

2016-07-11 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 69606179

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150629

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150702

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150623

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150626

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-02 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2000-12-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-04-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000313

2000-03-22 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

2000-02-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 69606179

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20000217

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-09-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980722

1998-05-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980119

1998-05-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT