Global Patent Index - EP 0842690 B8

EP 0842690 B8 2002-09-18 - FILTERING DEVICE USING FLUSH WASHING

Title (en)

FILTERING DEVICE USING FLUSH WASHING

Title (de)

FILTERVORRICHTUNG MIT SPÜLWÄSCHE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE FILTRAGE A CHASSE

Publication

EP 0842690 B8 (EN)

Application

EP 96918874 A

Priority

  • JP 9601724 W
  • JP 19938895 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6033558A] PCT No. PCT/JP96/01724 Sec. 371 Date Feb. 3, 1998 Sec. 102(e) Date Feb. 3, 1998 PCT Filed Jun. 20, 1996 PCT Pub. No. WO97/05939 PCT Pub. Date Feb. 20, 1997A self-gush-cleaning filter device comprises a filter casing (1) provided with an inlet passage (a) and an outlet passage (d), a screen (11) disposed within the filter casing (1) so as to slide along the inner surface of the filter casing (1) in the flowing direction of a fluid, a foreign matter ejecting opening (15) being formed between the screen (11) and the inlet passage (a). A drive shaft (4) for driving the screen (11), a screen driving unit (3) for driving the drive shaft (4) so as to move the screen (11) quickly in a downstream direction in which the fluid flows from the inlet passage (a) toward the outlet passage (d) and to move the screen slowly in an upstream direction. An outlet shutoff valve (14) is disposed in the outlet passage (d) of the filter casing (1). The screen driving unit (3) is actuated after closing the outlet shutoff valve (14) to move the screen (11). When the screen (11) is moved quickly in the downstream direction, the fluid gushes from the downstream side through the screen (11) into the upstream side, and the foreign matters deposited on the screen (11) are removed from the screen (11) by the force of the gushing fluid.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01D 29/62; B01D 29/70; B01D 35/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01D 29/01 (2006.01); B01D 36/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01D 36/02 (2013.01); B01D 29/01 (2013.01); B01D 29/117 (2013.01); B01D 29/6423 (2013.01); B01D 29/6484 (2013.01); B01D 29/66 (2013.01); B01D 29/70 (2013.01); B01D 29/72 (2013.01); B01D 2201/02 (2013.01); B01D 2201/188 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

US 6033558 A 20000307; AU 6138196 A 19970305; CN 1065448 C 20010509; CN 1196687 A 19981021; DE 69619989 D1 20020425; EP 0842690 A1 19980520; EP 0842690 A4 19990107; EP 0842690 B1 20020320; EP 0842690 B8 20020918; JP 3047125 B2 20000529; KR 100429118 B1 20040616; WO 9705939 A1 19970220

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150620

2016-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150620

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140618

- Year of fee payment: 19

2008-08-20 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2003-03-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021223

2002-12-27 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2002-07-31 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: KABUSHIKI KAISHA YOKOTA SEISAKUSHO

2002-07-31 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: YOKOTA, HIROSHI

2002-06-21 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020621

2002-04-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69619989 20020425

2002-03-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-03-20 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020320

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010216

1999-01-07 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

1999-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-05-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980204

1998-05-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB