Global Patent Index - EP 0842746 B1

EP 0842746 B1 2003-06-04 - Method and device for trimming the non-bound edges of bound printed products fed either singly or stacked

Title (en)

Method and device for trimming the non-bound edges of bound printed products fed either singly or stacked

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Beschneiden der offenen Seitenkanten einzeln oder in Lagen zugeführter, gebundener Druckerzeugnisse und Einrichtung zu dessen Durchführung

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour couper les côtés ouverts de produits imprimés et reliés, délivrés un par un ou en couches

Publication

EP 0842746 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97810841 A

Priority

CH 283596 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0842746A2] The method involves gripping the products (4-6) with a positioning device (7). The products are then passed to a cutting device (2) by a turning and translatory motion. The cutting of the head and foot edges of two products is done in a single working stroke. One of the printed products may be cut at the head edge and the other at the foot edge, or the cutting of both may be done at the head edge only or at the foot edge only.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26D 7/01; B26D 7/02; B26D 7/06; B26D 1/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 1/30 (2006.01); B26D 7/01 (2006.01); B26D 7/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26D 7/06 (2013.01); B26D 7/015 (2013.01); B26D 7/0675 (2013.01); B26D 2007/0056 (2013.01); B26D 2007/0081 (2013.01); Y10S 83/934 (2013.01); Y10T 83/051 (2015.04); Y10T 83/6667 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0842746 A2 19980520; EP 0842746 A3 19981111; EP 0842746 B1 20030604; DE 59710212 D1 20030710; JP H10180690 A 19980707; US 6302007 B1 20011016

INPADOC legal status


2013-11-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121130

2013-11-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121110

2013-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130601

2013-09-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59710212

- Effective date: 20130601

2013-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121110

2013-08-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130731

2013-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121130

2013-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121130

2013-07-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20121110

2013-06-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20120223

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20111130

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101120

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101213

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101118

- Year of fee payment: 14

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-04-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-10-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59710212 P 20030710

2003-06-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2003-06-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-04-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010306

1999-07-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

1999-06-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990407

1998-11-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-11-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-05-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1998-05-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI