Global Patent Index - EP 0842774 B1

EP 0842774 B1 2000-12-27 - Device at a printing machine for perforating, die-cutting, cutting, creasing and spot varnishing or for envelope printing

Title (en)

Device at a printing machine for perforating, die-cutting, cutting, creasing and spot varnishing or for envelope printing

Title (de)

Vorrichtung an einer Druckmaschine zum Perforieren, Stanzen, Schneiden, Rillen und partiellen Lackieren oder zum Drucken von Umschlägen

Title (fr)

Dispositif dans une machine à imprimer pour perforer, poinconner, couper, canneler et pour vernir partiellement ou pour imprimer des envelopes

Publication

EP 0842774 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97810776 A

Priority

  • EP 97810776 A
  • EP 96810715 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0842774A2] The means for perforating, die-cutting, cutting or creasing in printing machines comprises a supporting foil (4) which at two of its opposite sides is provided with strips (13) to be mounted onto fixing means (16) at a rubber blanket cylinder (3) of a printing unit, whereby the means (5) for perforating, die-cutting, cutting or creasing are affixed to the supporting foil (4) mounted onto the rubber blanket cylinder (3) of the printing unit, the impression cylinder (2) co-operating with the rubber blanket cylinder (3) being covered with a protection foil (22). The use of a relatively stiff supporting foil (4) instead of a rubber blanket allows a much cleaner and quicker perforation and punching and the affixing of the means (5) for perforating, die-cutting, cutting or creasing to the supporting foil (4) on the rubber blanket cylinder (3) allows a much easier and more precise positioning of same. Thanks to that, the means can also be used in endless printing machines. Moreover, the use of an independent underlying blanket (15) allows an exact calibration of the total thickness of the supporting foil (4) comprising the means (5). <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41G 7/00; B41F 5/24; B41F 19/00; B41F 23/08; B41F 30/04; B41K 3/12; B41N 6/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 7/26 (2006.01); B41F 19/00 (2006.01); B41F 23/08 (2006.01); B41F 30/04 (2006.01); B41G 7/00 (2006.01); B41N 6/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41N 6/00 (2013.01); B26D 7/2614 (2013.01); B41F 19/00 (2013.01); B41F 19/008 (2013.01); B41F 23/08 (2013.01); B41F 30/04 (2013.01); B41G 7/00 (2013.01); B26D 2007/2607 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0842774 A2 19980520; EP 0842774 A3 19980805; EP 0842774 B1 20001227

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160503

2016-05-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69703783

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141022

- Year of fee payment: 18

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081016

2009-10-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081031

2009-07-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20090630

2009-06-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20081016

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071016

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071023

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-05-21 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27O

- Effective date: 20021105

2003-01-02 [RTI2] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI2

- Free Format Text: DEVICE AT A PRINTING MACHINE FOR PERFORATING, DIE-CUTTING, CUTTING, CREASING AND SPOT VARNISHING OR FOR ENVELOPE PRINTING

2002-03-27 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: PPP INTERNATIONAL AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-21 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2001-11-21 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: KOENIG & BAUER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Effective date: 20010926

2001-11-21 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: MAN ROLAND DRUCKMASCHINEN AG

- Effective date: 20010927

2001-10-03 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2001-04-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-02-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69703783

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-02-01

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-06-14 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: DEVICE AT A PRINTING MACHINE FOR PERFORATING, DIE-CUTTING, CUTTING, CREASING AND SPOT VARNISHING OR FOR ENVELOPE PRINTING

1999-08-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HANS E. RUPRECHT HOLDING AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-04-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

1999-04-21 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-03-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990127

1998-11-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980911

1998-08-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-05-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB