Global Patent Index - EP 0842837 B1

EP 0842837 B1 2001-02-07 - Transporting plant with aerial cable and releasable cable grippers including means for measuring the clamping force of the cable grippers.

Title (en)

Transporting plant with aerial cable and releasable cable grippers including means for measuring the clamping force of the cable grippers.

Title (de)

Transportanlage mit Luftseil und kuppelbaren Seilklemmen mit Mitteln zum Messen der Klemmkraft der Seilklemmen

Title (fr)

Installation de transport à câble aérien, à pinces débrayables, comprenant des moyens de mesure du serrage du câble par les pinces

Publication

EP 0842837 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97402637 A

Priority

FR 9613987 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0842837A1] The mechanism comprises a jaw clamp (6,7) which locks a cabin or seat onto the cable (3) when the jaws and closed, a control lever (11) to open and close the clamp, one end of the lever forming the moving jaw (7), and a spring (19) to operate the control lever. The control lever is actuated by a ramp extending along the clamp line of travel, while a detector ensures that the clamp is fastened tightly to the cable when in the closed position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61B 12/12; B61B 12/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61B 12/06 (2006.01); B61B 12/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61B 12/122 (2013.01); B61B 12/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH ES FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0842837 A1 19980520; EP 0842837 B1 20010207; AT 199077 T 20010215; CA 2219451 A1 19980515; FR 2755930 A1 19980522; FR 2755930 B1 19981231; JP H10181584 A 19980707

INPADOC legal status


2002-09-06 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2002-08-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2002-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020730

2002-07-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-01-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011130

2001-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011130

2001-02-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH ES FR IT LI

2001-02-07 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20010207

2001-02-07 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010207

2001-02-07 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010207

2001-02-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 199077 T 20010215

2000-07-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000518

1999-03-18 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

1999-02-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH ES FR IT LI

1999-02-03 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT CH ES FR IT LI

1998-08-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980613

1998-05-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH ES FR IT LI

1998-05-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI