Global Patent Index - EP 0842868 B1

EP 0842868 B1 2001-01-03 - Package, in particular for sewing machine needles or similar elongated articles

Title (en)

Package, in particular for sewing machine needles or similar elongated articles

Title (de)

Verpackung, insbesondere für Nähmaschinennadeln oder dergleichen längliche Gegenstände

Title (fr)

Emballage, en particulier pour aiguilles de machine à coudre ou objets similaires allongés

Publication

EP 0842868 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97117890 A

Priority

DE 19646845 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19646845C1] The packaging comprises a flat housing section (2) with holders (6) on one side for the individual objects, and a flat cover section (3) connected to the housing section by a hinge (4). There are fixtures (21,22) to anchor the folded down cover section on the housing section, and locking lugs (13) are located on the side opposite the hinge. The lugs can be operated independently of each other, and can be pivoted between an open and a locked closed position via a film hinge (15).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 85/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 25/10 (2006.01); B65D 43/16 (2006.01); B65D 85/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 43/162 (2013.01); B65D 25/10 (2013.01); B65D 85/24 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19646845 C1 19980212; EP 0842868 A1 19980520; EP 0842868 B1 20010103; ES 2153154 T3 20010216; JP 3283808 B2 20020520; JP H10147387 A 19980602; US 5853087 A 19981229

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161024

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161012

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161031

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20151028

- Year of fee payment: 19

2002-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-01 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-04-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010308

2001-03-05 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2001-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2153154 T3

2001-02-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702850 20010208

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

1999-02-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB IT

1999-02-03 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

1999-01-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981208

1998-08-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980626

1998-05-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

1998-05-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI