Global patent index - EP 0843047 B1

EP 0843047 B1 2000-03-15 - Sweeping unit especially for mounting on a vehicule or a trailer

Title (en)

Sweeping unit especially for mounting on a vehicule or a trailer

Title (de)

Kehraggregat zum Anbau an einem Trägerfahrzeug oder einem Anhänger

Title (fr)

Unité de balayage pour le montage sur un véhicule ou une remorque

Publication

EP 0843047 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96118478 A

Priority

EP 96118478 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0843047A1] The sweeper comprises a rotatable, motor-driven roller brush raisable and lowerable by a lifter to different ground heights. On the lifter, a regulator acts with the ground distance of the roller brush as an adjustment. The regulating extent of the regulator is the drive torque for the roller brush or a proportional extent in relation to it. A signal representing the speed of the roller brush is connected to the regulating unit and this constitutes a speed-dependent theoretical value for the work torque for the roller brush. The roller brush is driven by a hydrostatic hydraulic motor and the hydraulic pressure for the hydraulic motor is the regulating entity for the regulating unit.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01H 1/05

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01H 1/05 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01H 1/056 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FI FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0843047 A1 19980520; EP 0843047 B1 20000315; AT 190686 T 20000415; DE 59604697 D1 20000420

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160601

2016-07-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151130

2016-07-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151130

2016-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2016-06-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59604697

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150128

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141120

- Year of fee payment: 19

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PCAR

- Free Format Text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2001-02-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-11-18 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001118

2000-09-13 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20000315

2000-08-11 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-04-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59604697

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-04-20

2000-03-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FI FR GB IT LI SE

2000-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-03-15 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000315

2000-03-15 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000315

2000-03-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000315

2000-03-15 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000315

2000-03-15 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000315

2000-03-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 190686

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-04-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-02-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE FI FR GB IT LI SE

1999-02-03 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FI FR GB IT LI SE

1998-05-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970606

1998-05-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FI FR GB IT LI SE

1998-05-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI