Global Patent Index - EP 0843049 B1

EP 0843049 B1 2002-09-25 - Apparatus and methods to create perviousness in a trench wall

Title (en)

Apparatus and methods to create perviousness in a trench wall

Title (de)

Einrichtung und Verfahren zur Durchlässigkeitserzeugung in einer Schlitzwand

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédés pour créer une perméabilité dans une paroi étanche dans le sol

Publication

EP 0843049 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97402757 A

Priority

FR 9614021 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0843049A1] The system consists of a duct through the partition (1) between two trenches filled with a drainage material. The duct has a shutter which can be in the form of a rotary plate or an inflatable balloon, controlled from the surface by a rod or tube (8) running through the middle of the partition wall. Once the structure being protected by the underground partition wall has been completed the duct can be opened to allow a normal flow of ground water.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02D 19/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02D 19/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02D 19/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0843049 A1 19980520; EP 0843049 B1 20020925; AT 224982 T 20021015; DE 69715779 D1 20021031; DE 69715779 T2 20030522; FR 2755986 A1 19980522; FR 2755986 B1 19990205

INPADOC legal status


2012-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111130

2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111117

2012-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111130

2012-08-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120731

2012-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111117

2012-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SOLETANCHE BACHY FRANCE

- Effective date: 20111130

2011-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-08-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110601

2011-08-11 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69715779

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-08-11 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69715779

- Effective date: 20110601

2011-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20101221

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-06-15 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110601

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101123

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20101112

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091117

2010-02-26 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20091020

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091116

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-02-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20081021

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030626

2002-12-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021209

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69715779 20021031

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR GB NL

2002-09-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 224982 T 20021015

2000-06-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000515

1999-02-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE DE FR GB NL

1999-02-03 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR GB NL

1998-12-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981016

1998-05-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR GB NL

1998-05-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI