Global Patent Index - EP 0843064 A3

EP 0843064 A3 2000-09-13 - Fitting for a window

Title (en)

Fitting for a window

Title (de)

Beschlag für ein Fenster

Title (fr)

Ferrure pour un fenêtre

Publication

EP 0843064 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97118314 A

Priority

DE 19646982 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0843064A2] The fixture has a part (20,30) in a rabbet groove (11). A holder (40) on the fixture works with two opposing groove walls (12) of the groove. A clamp (42) extends along the facing groove wall. In the direction of this wall, the holder has an extending projection, which can be held in the rabbet groove (1). Alternatively, the fixture may have two parts, one (30) fixed, the other (20,60) movable. The movable part moves against the resistance of the holder relatively to the fixed part. The holder may have a friction surface facing the movable part and working in conjunction with it.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 15/52; B23P 21/00; E05C 9/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 17/00 (2006.01); E05C 9/00 (2006.01); E05C 9/06 (2006.01); E05C 9/22 (2006.01); E05D 15/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/004 (2013.01); E05B 17/0012 (2013.01); E05D 15/52 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/148 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0843064 A2 19980520; EP 0843064 A3 20000913; EP 0843064 B1 20040303; AT 261044 T 20040315; CZ 293495 B6 20040512; CZ 9703596 A3 19981014; DE 19646982 A1 19980520; HU 222421 B1 20030728; HU 9702009 A1 19980728; HU 9702009 D0 19980128; PL 185423 B1 20030530; PL 323121 A1 19980525

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151022

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-10-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-10-19 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ROTO FRANK AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59711364

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-09-24 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R084

- Ref Document Number: 59711364

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-07-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121022

2013-06-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 261044

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20121022

2012-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111022

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101028

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101007

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-10-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: ROTO FRANK AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2007-05-16 [27C] TERMINATION OF OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27C

- Effective date: 20070109

2005-01-19 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: SIEGENIA-AUBI KG.

- Effective date: 20041129

2004-10-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-04-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2004-04-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59711364

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-04-08

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2003-10-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: KOHLER, JUERGEN

2003-10-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: MUELLERBADER, SIEGFRIED

2003-07-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030613

2001-05-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE FR IT LI

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001018

2000-09-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7E 05C 9/00 A, 7E 05C 9/20 B, 7E 05B 17/00 B

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

1998-05-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

1998-05-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI