Global Patent Index - EP 0843325 B1

EP 0843325 B1 2000-05-17 - Small transformer

Title (en)

Small transformer

Title (de)

Kleintransformator

Title (fr)

Petit transformateur

Publication

EP 0843325 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97119679 A

Priority

DE 29619953 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0843325A1] The transformer has a plastic housing with closable covering hood (21) and contg. a two-arm plate core (3,4) with shape-locking packet parts, with primary and secondary coils on the arms, whereby at least one coil can be switched off and/or one coil is protected by a thermally varied current limiter resistance. Lateral supporting plates (7) associated with the coil bodies (1,2) extend to the transformer base plate (8) and cover plate. A positive temp. coefficient resistance (32) is mounted on bars on a lower supporting plate. Hooks (10) on the base plate engage over vertical ribs (9) on the lower supporting plate. Spring hooks (25) on the base plate locate in openings (24) in the covering hood.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 27/40; H01F 27/02; H01F 27/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 27/02 (2006.01); H01F 27/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 27/02 (2013.01); H01F 27/402 (2013.01); H01F 2027/406 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29619953 U1 19970123; EP 0843325 A1 19980520; EP 0843325 B1 20000517

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151130

2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160601

2016-08-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160729

2016-06-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59701703

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141119

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-01-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141119

- Year of fee payment: 18

2003-07-02 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2003-05-23 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2002-12-24 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2002-11-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021111

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-12 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20011012

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-05-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000717

2000-07-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701703 20000621

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-05-17 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000517

2000-05-17 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000517

1999-03-10 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-02-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990112

1999-02-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

1999-02-03 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-12-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981014

1998-05-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1998-05-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI