Global Patent Index - EP 0843329 A3

EP 0843329 A3 2000-11-22 - Limit switch

Title (en)

Limit switch

Title (de)

Positionsschalter

Title (fr)

Interrupteur de position

Publication

EP 0843329 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97119251 A

Priority

DE 19647401 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0843329A2] The switch shaft (4) is provided with an only, practically circular outer toothed gear (6) on which an operating element (5) is mountable, with adapted inner-toothed gear (10) clamped in various angled positions. The operating element may be a switch-lever that is specifically made from moulded material or metal. There may be special inner toothed gears adapted on the special outer toothed gears that are located on both sided of the switch lever. The switch shaft may have, at its start at least one, projection (7), and the rotation of the switch shaft from a recess (8) of the drive housing (3) to a stop (9).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 21/22; H01H 21/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 21/28 (2006.01); H01H 21/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 21/285 (2013.01); H01H 21/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0843329 A2 19980520; EP 0843329 A3 20001122; EP 0843329 B1 20050601

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071104

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071130

2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071104

2008-11-14 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080930

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080603

2008-07-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071104

2007-01-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070122

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061130

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-11-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20061122

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-11-09 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20061109

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-05-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060302

2006-04-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-08-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050711

2005-07-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59712330 P 20050707

2005-06-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-06-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-08-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-02-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001218

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01H 21/22 A, 7H 01H 21/28 B

1998-05-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT