Global Patent Index - EP 0843390 B1

EP 0843390 B1 2000-11-15 - Universal manual crimping tool

Title (en)

Universal manual crimping tool

Title (de)

Universell verwendbare Handsickenzange

Title (fr)

Pince manuelle universelle

Publication

EP 0843390 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97111216 A

Priority

DE 19646785 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19646785C1] The tool has a base element (1) with a handle element (3) on one end and a gripping jaw (2) on the other and first and second slots (5,7) on its outer and inner narrow sides. A guide part (8,9) in the free space in the base element defined by the slots has first (9) and second (8) parts protruding through the outer and inner slots and is adjustable to define the operating width. A lever part (14) with a further grip element is linked to a rotation point. A pressure tool (13) with a shaft held in a through hole is linked to the lever and a single or double sided die is inserted and held between the pincer jaws and the pressure tool.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 43/042; B25B 27/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 7/02 (2006.01); B25B 7/12 (2006.01); B26F 1/36 (2006.01); H01R 43/042 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26F 1/36 (2013.01); B25B 7/02 (2013.01); B25B 7/12 (2013.01); H01R 43/0421 (2013.01); B26F 2001/365 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19646785 C1 19980305; EP 0843390 A2 19980520; EP 0843390 A3 19980603; EP 0843390 B1 20001115

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050703

2004-04-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040201

2004-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-02-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030703

2004-02-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040203

2004-02-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040201

2003-07-04 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030704

2003-07-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030703

2002-09-20 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020920

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-07-23 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20020723

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-07-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020717

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-07-17 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20020717

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-06-10 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020610

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-01-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001212

2000-12-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702638 20001221

2000-12-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-11-24 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE

1999-03-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990202

1999-02-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT NL SE

1999-02-24 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE

1998-12-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981103

1998-06-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-06-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

1998-05-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE

1998-05-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI