Global Patent Index - EP 0843394 B1

EP 0843394 B1 2000-05-17 - Ignition device for internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Ignition device for internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Zündvorrichtung für Verbrennungsmotor

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'allumage pour moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 0843394 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97120130 A

Priority

  • JP 30611596 A
  • JP 522197 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0843394A1] An ignition coil device, which is mounted in a plug hole of an internal combustion engine, comprises a primary coil 1 wound to have larger diameter, a secondary coil 2 wound on a bobbin 2A and disposed inside the primary coil 1, an iron core 3 disposed inside the bobbin 2A, and a shielding case 10 disposed around the primary coil 1, a gap between the primary coil 1 and the secondary coil 2 being filled with an insulating resin 12. The primary coil 1 is made bobbinless so as to secure and increase the withstand voltages of the primary coil and the secondary coil. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01T 13/44; H01F 38/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 38/12 (2006.01); H01T 13/44 (2006.01); H04L 27/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04L 27/0002 (2013.01); H01F 38/12 (2013.01); H01T 13/44 (2013.01); H01F 2038/122 (2013.01); Y10T 29/4902 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0843394 A1 19980520; EP 0843394 B1 20000517; DE 69702036 D1 20000621; DE 69702036 T2 20010118; JP H10199737 A 19980731; US 6255930 B1 20010703; US 6457229 B1 20021001

INPADOC legal status


2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101117

2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101117

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69702036

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69702036

- Effective date: 20110601

2011-08-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110801

2011-07-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101117

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091123

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20091111

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20091116

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091112

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-01-06 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Effective date: 20091215

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69702036 20000621

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-04-28 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO ROMA S.P.A.

1999-02-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

1999-02-03 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-09-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980810

1998-05-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971117

1998-05-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-05-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI