Global Patent Index - EP 0843514 B1

EP 0843514 B1 2003-06-18 - Method and mounting apparatus for mounting a component

Title (en)

Method and mounting apparatus for mounting a component

Title (de)

Verfahren und Einrichtung zur Montage von Bauteilen

Title (fr)

Méthode et appareil de montage de composants

Publication

EP 0843514 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97120210 A

Priority

JP 30690996 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0843514A2] There is disclosed a method for mounting a component on a specified position on a substrate by picking up a respective component from one of a pair of component supply units from which components of the same types can be supplied by a movable head unit. Said component supply units are opposing each other and consist of various and numerous feeders. Said substrate is arranged between said component supply units so that components are picked up from one component supply unit from one side and from the other component supply unit from the other side in case the one component supply unit is unable to supply the required components, whereat during the use of the other component supply unit the operation capability of the one component supply unit is restored <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05K 13/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23P 19/00 (2006.01); H05K 13/02 (2006.01); H05K 13/04 (2006.01); H05K 13/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05K 13/08 (2013.01); H05K 13/0452 (2013.01); Y10T 29/53174 (2013.01); Y10T 29/53178 (2013.01); Y10T 29/53183 (2013.01); Y10T 29/53261 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0843514 A2 19980520; EP 0843514 A3 19990407; EP 0843514 B1 20030618; DE 69722898 D1 20030724; DE 69722898 T2 20040519; JP 3402968 B2 20030506; JP H10150294 A 19980602; US 6058599 A 20000509

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100601

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081114

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-06-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040319

2003-07-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69722898 P 20030724

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE

1999-12-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE

1999-12-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990930

1999-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-05-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE