Global patent index - EP 0843527 B1

EP 0843527 B1 2000-09-27 - SUCTION HOOD FOR WET-CLEANING MACHINES FOR FLOORS

Title (en)

SUCTION HOOD FOR WET-CLEANING MACHINES FOR FLOORS

Title (de)

SAUGHAUBE FÜR FUSSBODEN-NASSREINIGUNGSMASCHINEN

Title (fr)

CALOTTE ASPIRANTE POUR MACHINES DE NETTOYAGE DE SOLS PAR VOIE HUMIDE

Publication

EP 0843527 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96914899 A

Priority

EP 9601546 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9737579A1] The invention relates to a suction hood (2) for floor wet-cleaning machines (1) in which a motor-operated scrubbing roll (3) acted upon by a fluid revolves about a (free-arm) axle, which is only fixed at one end, and inside the suction hood (2) covering the both ends of said axle. Said suction hood (2) is conveyed to be moved axially in relation to the scrubbing roll (3).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 11/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 11/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 11/302 (2013.01); A47L 11/4036 (2013.01); A47L 11/4041 (2013.01); A47L 11/4044 (2013.01); A47L 11/4061 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9737579 A1 19971016; AT 196597 T 20001015; EP 0843527 A1 19980527; EP 0843527 B1 20000927; US 5970571 A 19991026

INPADOC legal status

2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160410

2016-05-04 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20160410

2016-04-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150408

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150421

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150420

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150420

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-06-19 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20130523 AND 20130529

2013-04-19 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: NILFISK-ADVANCE A/S, DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

- Effective date: 20130318

2013-03-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL AND PARTN, CH

2013-03-28 [REG CH PCOW] CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF PATENT OWNER(S)

- Ref Legal Event Code: PCOW

- Free Format Text: NEW ADDRESS: VIA TURATI 16/18, 20121 MILANO (IT)

2013-03-28 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: NILFISK-ADVANCE A/S, DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2011-03-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: NILFISK ADVANCE, ITALIA SPA.

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: NILFISK ADVANCE ITALIA S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20010430

2001-09-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010430

2001-04-11 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010411

2001-03-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2001-01-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2001-01-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-12-27 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001227

2000-12-27 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001227

2000-12-15 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-12-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20001113

2000-09-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-09-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000927

2000-09-27 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000927

2000-09-27 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000927

2000-09-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 196597

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-10-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-08-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NILFISK ADVANCE, ITALIA SPA.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-10-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990819

1999-10-06 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

1998-05-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970425

1998-05-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE