Global Patent Index - EP 0843606 B1

EP 0843606 B1 2001-04-25 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MANUFACTURING WIRE-LATTICE MATS

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MANUFACTURING WIRE-LATTICE MATS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM HERSTELLEN VON DRAHTGITTERMATTEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR LA FABRICATION DE MATS EN TREILLIS METALLIQUE

Publication

EP 0843606 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97925767 A

Priority

  • AT 9700123 W
  • AT 104396 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9747409A1] Method and device for manufacturing wire-lattice mats from longitudinal and transverse wire (L,Q) that cross at right angles and are welded together at their crossing points, with the longitudinal wires being advanced in steps, and the transverse wires being moved transversely to the direction of the longitudinal wires along a welding line (2, 3) and welded to the longitudinal wires, with at least one of the transverse wires being tensioned (4, 5) to a preselected adjustable value after being fed into the welding line, and at least one end of this transverse wire (Q) being rotated (4, 5) about its longitudinal axis by a preselected adjustable angle (P6) before welding to the longitudinal wires (L), and then welded to them.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21F 27/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21F 27/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21F 27/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9747409 A1 19971218; AT 200748 T 20010515; AT 407501 B 20010425; AT A104396 A 20000815; DE 59703431 D1 20010531; EP 0843606 A1 19980527; EP 0843606 B1 20010425; US 6045031 A 20000404

INPADOC legal status


2006-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2006-01-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060103

2005-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050611

2004-08-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040830

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-06-23 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040623

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-04-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-06-11 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010611

2001-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59703431

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-05-31

2001-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2001-04-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE IT LI

2001-04-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 200748

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-05-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2001-03-29 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-07-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000523

2000-03-08 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE IT LI

1998-05-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980213

1998-05-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE IT LI