Global Patent Index - EP 0843749 B1

EP 0843749 B1 2000-02-09 - PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING POLYESTER YARNS

Title (en)

PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING POLYESTER YARNS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM HERSTELLEN VON POLYESTERGARNEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR LA PRODUCTION DE FILS DE POLYESTER

Publication

EP 0843749 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96926368 A

Priority

  • DE 19529135 A
  • EP 9603182 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19529135A1] The invention relates to a process for producing technical polyester yarns in which, for pre-drawing purposes, polyester filaments are heated in a heating region to a above the glass transition temperature and swept in counterflow by a gaseous medium. The polyester filaments are then re-drawn with an individual titre > 1 and a predetermined elongation ratio and wound at high speed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01D 5/098; D01D 5/088

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01D 5/16 (2006.01); D01F 6/62 (2006.01); D02J 1/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01F 6/62 (2013.01); D01D 5/16 (2013.01); D02J 1/228 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IE IT LU NL PT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19529135 A1 19970213; AU 6658096 A 19970305; BR 9609889 A 19991221; CN 1063497 C 20010321; CN 1142546 A 19970212; EP 0843749 A1 19980527; EP 0843749 B1 20000209; ES 2143772 T3 20000516; KR 100267601 B1 20001016; MX 9800950 A 19981129; PT 843749 E 20000731; US 5965073 A 19991012; WO 9706293 A1 19970220

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2009-11-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20070705

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080721

2009-09-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080721

2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080719

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080719

2009-05-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090201

2009-05-29 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090119

2009-05-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090331

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090203

2009-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090201

2009-03-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080719

2009-01-29 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20090119

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070710

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-01-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20070802

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070724

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070716

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070720

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-07-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070727

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-07-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070719

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-31 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Free text: KRUPP UHDE GMBH DE

- Effective date: 20010220

2001-03-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: KRUPP UHDE GMBH

2001-02-09 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2001-02-07 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2001-01-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-01-08 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010108

2001-01-03 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: KRUPP UHDE GMBH

2001-01-02 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: KRUPP UHDE GMBH

2000-12-31 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Free text: 20001129 *KRUPP UHDE G.M.B.M.:FRIEDRICH-UHDE-STRASSE 15, 44141 DORTMUND

2000-09-13 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2000-07-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000505

2000-07-19 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000719

2000-05-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2143772 T3

2000-05-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2000-05-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000411

2000-03-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604431 20000316

2000-03-06 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. A. GIAMBROCONO & C. S.R.L.

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IE IT LU NL PT

1999-04-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990302

1998-05-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980123

1998-05-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IE IT LU NL PT