Global Patent Index - EP 0843758 B1

EP 0843758 B1 2000-03-15 - ROLLER

Title (en)

ROLLER

Title (de)

WALZE

Title (fr)

ROULEAU

Publication

EP 0843758 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96919626 A

Priority

  • DE 9600976 W
  • DE 19529711 A
  • DE 29607233 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9707281A1] A roller (10) for treating webs of paper, cardboard, plastic, textiles and the like has a cylindrical roller body (1) and a coating (2) of a lead alloy applied to it and forming the processing surface (5) of the roller. The coating (2) is in turn coated with a layer (4) of hard materials providing wear resistance.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21G 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B32B 1/08 (2006.01); D21G 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21G 1/0233 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FI FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9707281 A1 19970227; CA 2229214 A1 19970227; EP 0843758 A1 19980527; EP 0843758 B1 20000315; JP H11509279 A 19990817

INPADOC legal status


2002-01-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20010604

2001-06-04 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010604

2001-06-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010604

2001-04-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010403

2001-02-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-11 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-06-26 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20000626

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-06-19 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20000619

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-04-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604698 20000420

2000-04-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000316

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FI FR GB IT SE

2000-03-15 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000315

2000-03-15 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000315

2000-03-15 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000315

2000-03-15 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000315

1999-01-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981127

1998-05-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980115

1998-05-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FI FR GB IT SE