Global Patent Index - EP 0843760 B1

EP 0843760 B1 2000-12-27 - RAM

Title (en)

RAM

Title (de)

RAMME

Title (fr)

DAME

Publication

EP 0843760 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96929212 A

Priority

  • DE 19529538 A
  • EP 9603470 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19529538A1] The invention concerns a ram which is additionally provided with a compressed air reservoir (68) such that the ram can be driven alternatively in diesel mode and compressed air mode. The compressed air reservoir (68) can be connected to the working chamber (62) of the cylinder (10) by means of a servo valve (64, 70, 74).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02D 7/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02D 7/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02D 7/26 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19529538 A1 19970213; CN 1192794 A 19980909; EP 0843760 A1 19980527; EP 0843760 B1 20001227; TW 323309 B 19971221; US 6102133 A 20000815; WO 9707293 A1 19970227

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20030301

2003-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030301

2003-03-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030301

2001-12-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-10-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011019

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-08-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010830

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-05-25 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2001-02-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59606259

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-02-01

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE NL

1999-09-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990813

1998-11-25 [19U] DATE OF INTERRUPTION (INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 19U

- Effective date: 19980701

1998-11-25 [19W] DATE OF RESUMPTION (AFTER INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 19W

- Effective date: 19981219

1998-05-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980117

1998-05-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE NL